Leon et al v. Quality Ceiling Refinishing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dwayne Young, Juan J. Lopez and Henry Leon
Defendant: John E. Pesce, Anthony Pesce and Quality Ceiling Refinishing, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01528
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Parties' Counsel to Appear Telephonically at Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/8/2019. (SMB)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at FLSA Settlement Conference by Henry Leon, Juan J. Lopez, Dwayne Young. (Bober, Peter) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 VERIFIED summary by Anthony Pesce, John E. Pesce, Quality Ceiling Refinishing, Inc. (Love, Randall)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 FLSA scheduling order by Henry Leon, Juan J. Lopez, Dwayne Young. (Bober, Peter)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 FLSA scheduling order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Henry Leon, Juan J. Lopez, Dwayne Young. Related case(s): n (Bober, Peter)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #7 FLSA scheduling order by Henry Leon, Juan J. Lopez, Dwayne Young. (Bober, Peter)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff shall answer the Court's interrogatories within 20 days. (See Order for additional details and instructions.) Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(SMB)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Anthony Pesce, John E. Pesce, Quality Ceiling Refinishing, Inc. Related case(s): no (Love, Randall) Modified text on 7/11/2019 (BSN).
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Anthony Pesce, John E. Pesce, Quality Ceiling Refinishing, Inc. (Love, Randall) Modified text on 7/11/2019 (BSN).
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Anthony Pesce, John E. Pesce, Quality Ceiling Refinishing, Inc.(Love, Randall) Modified text on 7/11/2019 (BSN).
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Anthony Pesce, John E. Pesce, Quality Ceiling Refinishing, Inc. (BSN)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-1528-T-30TGW. (SJB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15613892) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Bober, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leon et al v. Quality Ceiling Refinishing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Pesce
Represented By: Randall J. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Pesce
Represented By: Randall J. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Ceiling Refinishing, Inc.
Represented By: Randall J. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Young
Represented By: Peter Bober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan J. Lopez
Represented By: Peter Bober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Leon
Represented By: Peter Bober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?