Cypress Lakes Associates, LTD. et al v. Nice, et al
Plaintiff: CYPRESS LAKES REALTY GROUP LLC and CYPRESS LAKES ASSOCIATES, LTD.
Defendant: KERRY J NICE, JR, TITANIUM MOBILE HOME BROKER, LLC, CATHY NICE, TITANIUM REAL ESTATE, LLC and Kerry J. Nice, Jr.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01540
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Cathy Nice, Kerry J. Nice, Jr., Titanium Mobile Home Broker, LLC, Titanium Real Estate, LLC.(Willhoit, Rashida)
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Cathy Nice, Kerry J. Nice, Jr, Titanium Mobile Home Broker, LLC, Titanium Real Estate, LLC. (Gegan, Edmund)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cathy Nice, Kerry J. Nice, Jr., Titanium Mobile Home Broker, LLC, Titanium Real Estate, LLC. Related case(s): No (Gegan, Edmund)
August 4, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on July 1, 2019 by Cypress Lakes Associates, LTD., Cypress Lakes Realty Group LLC as to Kerry J. Nice, Jr. (Matulis, James)
August 4, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on July 1, 2019 by Cypress Lakes Associates, LTD., Cypress Lakes Realty Group LLC as to Titanium Mobile Home Broker, LLC. (Matulis, James)
August 4, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on July 1, 2019 by Cypress Lakes Associates, LTD., Cypress Lakes Realty Group LLC as to Titanium Real Estate, LLC. (Matulis, James)
August 4, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on July 1, 2019 by Cypress Lakes Associates, LTD., Cypress Lakes Realty Group LLC as to Cathy Nice. (Matulis, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice (no related cases) per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cypress Lakes Associates, LTD., Cypress Lakes Realty Group LLC. Related case(s): no (Matulis, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Cypress Lakes Associates, LTD., Cypress Lakes Realty Group LLC. (Matulis, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 ***TERMINATED, contacted counsel to refile using the proper event.***PROOF of service by Cypress Lakes Associates, LTD., Cypress Lakes Realty Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Proof of Service)(Matulis, James) Modified text on 8/2/2019 (LNR).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to complaint on or before 8/16/2019. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/18/2019. (CCB)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Willhoit, Rashida) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund J. Gegan on behalf of Cathy Nice, Kerry J. Nice, Jr, Titanium Mobile Home Broker, LLC, Titanium Real Estate, LLC (Gegan, Edmund)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rashida L. Willhoit on behalf of Cathy Nice, Kerry J. Nice, Jr, Titanium Mobile Home Broker, LLC, Titanium Real Estate, LLC (Willhoit, Rashida)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/28/2019. (SAO)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Cathy Nice, Kerry J. Nice, Jr, Titanium Mobile Home Broker, LLC, Titanium Real Estate, LLC. (KMM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (KMM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-1540-T-02JSS. (SJB)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Injunctive Relief Requested against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15619575) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '102 Trademark Registration, #2 Exhibit B - '175 Trademark Registration, #3 Exhibit C- Pre-suit demand letter, #4 Exhibit D- Pre-suit demand letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons)(Matulis, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cypress Lakes Associates, LTD. et al v. Nice, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERRY J NICE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITANIUM MOBILE HOME BROKER, LLC
Represented By: Edmund J. Gegan
Represented By: Rashida L. Willhoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHY NICE
Represented By: Edmund J. Gegan
Represented By: Rashida L. Willhoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITANIUM REAL ESTATE, LLC
Represented By: Edmund J. Gegan
Represented By: Rashida L. Willhoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry J. Nice, Jr.
Represented By: Edmund J. Gegan
Represented By: Rashida L. Willhoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYPRESS LAKES REALTY GROUP LLC
Represented By: James Michael Matulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYPRESS LAKES ASSOCIATES, LTD.
Represented By: James Michael Matulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?