City of St. Petersburg v. CSX Transportation, Inc.

Plaintiff: City of St. Petersburg
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01541
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gene Payne)(Bilik, Robert)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Patrick Dover on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Dover, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Walsh, Sean)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc... (Walsh, Sean)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by City of St. Petersburg. Related case(s): No (Tennant, Bradley)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by City of St. Petersburg. (Tennant, Bradley)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Eric Bilik on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Bilik, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law #7. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before August 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/11/2019. (LJB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Walsh, Sean) Modified event type on 7/11/2019 (CTR).
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED/PROOF of service by City of St. Petersburg (Tennant, Bradley) Modified on 7/9/2019 (CTR).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/1/2019. (BGS)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/1/2019. (BGS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc. (CTR)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-1541-T-36CPT. (SJB)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Quiet Title and Declaratory Action against CSX Transportation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15619698) filed by City of St. Petersburg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Tennant, Bradley) Modified text only on 6/27/2019 (CTR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of St. Petersburg v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of St. Petersburg
Represented By: Bradley S. Tennant
Represented By: Kenneth Wallace MacCollom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Patrick Walsh
Represented By: Robert Patrick Dover
Represented By: Robert Eric Bilik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?