Karamelion LLC v. Guardian Protection Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Karamelion LLC
Defendant: Guardian Protection Services, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01558
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part the unopposed second motion to extend time to file Case Management Report and to respond to the Complaint. (Doc. #17). Case Management Report and response to the Complaint now due September 3, 2019. The Court will be disinclined to extend these deadlines any further. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/22/2019. (DMD)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to File Case Management Report, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 10 Order, #1 Complaint by Karamelion LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wernow, Howard)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff Karamelion LLC's unopposed motion for extension of time is granted. (Doc. #15). The Case Management Report is now due August 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/7/2019. (MWS)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by Karamelion LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
July 30, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney David R. Bennett (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057524.) Related document: #11 MOTION for David R. Bennett to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 motion for David R. Bennett to appear pro hac vice. If counsel has not already done so, within 10 days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 7/26/2019. (AHA)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting the unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the Complaint. (Doc. #12). Defendant's response to the Complaint now due August 26, 2019. However, this extension does not affect the deadline to file the Case Management Report for patent cases, which is due on August 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/26/2019. (DMD)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Karamelion LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for David R. Bennett to appear pro hac vice by Karamelion LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wernow, Howard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by August 9, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report for patent cases. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/23/2019. (DMD)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 07/05/2019 by Karamelion LLC as to Guardian Protection Services, Inc. (Wernow, Howard)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Karamelion LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wernow, Howard)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BES)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Guardian Protection Services, Inc.. (BES)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/28/2019. (TWL)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/28/2019. (TWL)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Karamelion LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-1558-T-33CPT. (SJB)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Guardian Protection Services, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15629311) filed by Karamelion LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Pat. No. 6,275,166, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Pat. No. 6,873,245, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karamelion LLC v. Guardian Protection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karamelion LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Represented By: David R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Protection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?