Jabil, Inc. v. Essentium, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jabil, Inc.
Defendant: Erik Gjovik, Lars Uffhausen, Essentium, Inc., Greg Ojeda, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Essentium Materials LLC, Jason Greene, Blake Teipel and Chad Eichele
Not Classified By Court: Jay M. Cohen and Manuel Menendez, Jr.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01567
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Steven D Merryday
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Wesley Proulx on behalf of Chad Eichele, Jason Greene (Proulx, Aaron)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorneys Paul U. Chistolini, William G.K. Smoak, Aaron W. Proulx, and Chance C. Arias for Defendants Erik Gjovik and William "Terry" Macneish III. Attorney Thomas Folger Brink and Paul Leon Hammond terminated. (DK)
September 17, 2020 Filing 92 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Erik Gjovik, Jason Greene, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III. (Smoak, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
September 17, 2020 Filing 91 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by Erik Gjovik, Jason Greene, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III. (Smoak, William)
September 16, 2020 Filing 90 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chad Eichele, Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Erik Gjovik, Jason Greene, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Blake Teipel, Lars Uffhausen, Steven Birdwell, Gene Birdwell with Jury Demand. filed by Jabil, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Weinstein, David)
September 16, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Chance C. Arias on behalf of Chad Eichele, Jason Greene (Arias, Chance)
September 16, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by William Glenn Kemper Smoak on behalf of Jason Greene (Smoak, William)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ENDORSED ORDER granting #85 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Joshua S Smith; Daniel Andrew Nicholas and Brian David Rubenstein terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 9/16/2020. (Flynn, Sean)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #81--motion to amend the complaint; amended complaint due 9/25/2020; denying #83--motion to reply. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/16/2020. (BK)
September 15, 2020 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION for Brian Rubenstein, Joshua Smith and Daniel Nicholas and law firm Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A. to Withdraw as Attorney by Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Blake Teipel, Lars Uffhausen. (Rubenstein, Brian)
September 15, 2020 Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re #83 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Submit Reply in Support of Unopposed Motion to Amend filed by Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Blake Teipel, Lars Uffhausen. (Dupre, Steven)
September 14, 2020 Filing 83 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Submit Reply in Support of Unopposed Motion to Amend by Jabil, Inc. (Weinstein, David) Modified on 9/15/2020 (DG).
September 14, 2020 Filing 82 RESPONSE to Motion re #81 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Blake Teipel, Lars Uffhausen. (Dupre, Steven)
September 11, 2020 Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint by Jabil, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Weinstein, David) Modified on 9/14/2020 (DG).
September 4, 2020 Filing 80 MEDIATION report Hearing held on August 21, 2020. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Menendez, Manuel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 79 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #69 Amended Complaint by Chad Eichele.(Smoak, William)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #73--motion for an extension of deadlines; granting motion for an order referring the parties to mediation; directing the parties to comply with each deadline specified in the motion; directing the parties to mediate by 8/21/2020 before Manuel Menendez, Jr. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/24/2020. (BK)
July 23, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by William Glenn Kemper Smoak on behalf of Chad Eichele (Smoak, William)
July 20, 2020 Filing 76 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #69 Amended Complaint by William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III.(Riopelle, Joseph)
July 20, 2020 Filing 75 Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #69 Amended Complaint by Erik Gjovik.(Hammond, Paul)
July 20, 2020 Filing 74 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #69 Amended Complaint by Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Blake Teipel, Lars Uffhausen.(Dupre, Steven)
July 17, 2020 Filing 73 Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order and for Appointment of Mediator by Jabil, Inc. (Weinstein, David) Modified on 7/17/2020 (DG).
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71--motion for an extension of time; extending through 7/20/2020 the time within which the defendants must respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/9/2020. (BK)
July 6, 2020 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint by Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Erik Gjovik, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Blake Teipel, Lars Uffhausen. (Rubenstein, Brian)
June 19, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Jabil, Inc. (Weinstein, David)
June 19, 2020 Filing 69 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Jabil, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Weinstein, David)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: excluding Count IX, the defendants' motion (Doc. #20) to dismiss is denied; dismissing without prejudice Count IX; granting #58--motion to amend; amended complaint due 6/19/2020. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/29/2020. (BK)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Joint Motion to Extend Certain Scheduling Order Deadlines. New deadlines are as follows: Completion of Discovery is due by 12/14,2020; Dispositive Motions are due by 2/8/2021; Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Tampa Courtroom 11B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Jury Trial set on the July 2021 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/15/2020. (NCR)
April 13, 2020 Filing 66 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Three Months by All Defendants. (Rubenstein, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #38 Defendants' Motion to Amend the Stipulated Protective Order Entered on October 16, 2019. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 3/4/2020. (NCR)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #61 Motion for Protective Order. Unless otherwise ordered, this Court does not retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of this Supplemental Order following the final disposition of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 2/12/2020. (Flynn, Sean)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying #32 Motion to Compel; granting #51 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 2/12/2020. (Flynn, Sean)
January 31, 2020 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Erik Gjovik, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Greg Ojeda, Lars Uffhausen. (McCoy, Kevin)
January 29, 2020 Filing 61 Joint MOTION for protective order by Jabil, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion to Substitute Attorney. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/27/2020. (NCR)
January 23, 2020 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Defendants Gjovik, Ojeda and MacNeish by All Defendants. (Rubenstein, Brian)
January 22, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Jabil, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Weinstein, David)
January 17, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Corrected Appearance by Bruce S. Liebman on behalf of Greg Ojeda (Liebman, Bruce)
January 17, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce S. Liebman on behalf of Greg Ojeda (Liebman, Bruce) COUNSEL WHO ELECTRONICALLY FILED THIS ITEM HAS TO HAVE ELECTRONICALLY SIGNED SAME. ITEM TO BE REFILED BY BRUCE S. LIEBMAN WITH HIS ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE, USING HIS OWN PERSONAL ECF LOGIN/PASSWORD. Modified on 1/17/2020 (DG).
January 16, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbye Erika Alexander on behalf of Greg Ojeda (Alexander, Abbye)
January 15, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina Hernandez Villar on behalf of Greg Ojeda (Hernandez Villar, Cristina) COUNSEL TO REFILE THREE SEPARATE NOTICES OF APPEARANCE, ONE FOR EACH ATTORNEY. THIS ITEM WAS LINKED TO CRISTINA HERNANDEZ VILLAR BUT NOT ELECTRONICALLY SIGNED BY HER. ITEM TO BE REFILED BY HERNANDEZ VILLAR, USING HER OWN PERSONAL ECF LOGIN/PASSWORD. EACH NOTICE OF APPEARANCE TO BE FILED BY COUNSEL LINKED TO EACH DOCUMENT PERTAINING TO SAID ATTORNEY, USING HIS/HER OWN PERSONAL ECF LOGIN/PASSWORD. Modified on 1/16/2020 (DG).
December 17, 2019 Filing 53 MEDIATION report Hearing held on December 9, 2019. Hearing outcome: Impasse. (Cohen, Jay) Modified on 12/18/2019 (DG).
December 16, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents filed by Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Erik Gjovik, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Greg Ojeda, Lars Uffhausen. (Rubenstein, Brian)
December 2, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents by Jabil, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jabil's First RFPs, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Responses & Objections to Jabil's First RFPs)(Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
November 25, 2019 Sealed Document [S-50]. (DG)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ENDORSED ORDER granting #45 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 11/25/2019. (Flynn, Sean)
November 22, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Stipulated Protective Order Entered on October 16, 2019 filed by Jabil, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Darcy Decl., #2 Exhibit B - Dulchinos Decl.)(Weinstein, David)
November 22, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S Smith on behalf of Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Erik Gjovik, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Greg Ojeda, Lars Uffhausen (Smith, Joshua)
November 21, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #40 Amended MOTION for leave to file reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Interrogatory Answers and for Protective Order filed by Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Erik Gjovik, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Greg Ojeda, Lars Uffhausen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubenstein, Brian)
November 18, 2019 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under seal by Jabil, Inc. (Weinstein, David) Modified on 11/19/2019 (DG).
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ENDORSED ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Interrogatory Answers and for Protective Order. Defendants' Reply is due 11/21/2019 and may not exceed five pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 11/18/2019. (NCR)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENDORSED ORDER denying #41 Jabil's motion to modify the mediation order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/18/2019.
November 18, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION to modify Mediation Order filed by Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Erik Gjovik, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Greg Ojeda, Lars Uffhausen. (Dupre, Steven)
November 15, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to modify Mediation Order by Jabil, Inc. (Weinstein, David) Modified on 11/18/2019 (DG).
November 12, 2019 Filing 40 Amended MOTION for leave to file reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Interrogatory Answers and for Protective Order by All Defendants. (Rubenstein, Brian)
November 12, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for leave to file reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Interrogatory Answers and for Protective Order by All Defendants. (Rubenstein, Brian) ITEM TERMINATED DUE TO THE FILING OF #40. Modified on 11/13/2019 (DG). Modified on 11/13/2019 (DG).
November 8, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Stipulated Protective Order Entered on October 16, 2019 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Rubenstein, Brian)
November 6, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Answers and for Protective Order filed by Jabil, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Response to Jabil's RFPs)(Weinstein, David)
November 6, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by Jabil, Inc. of Filing the Declaration of Mark Lanterman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Mark Lanterman)(Weinstein, David)
November 4, 2019 Sealed Document [S-35]. (DG)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED ORDER granting #33 Motion to Seal. Defendants shall file under seal Plaintiff's Interrogatory Responses, which shall remain under seal until the resolution of #32 Defendants' Motion to Compel and for Protective Order, unless otherwise ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 10/28/2019. (Flynn, Sean)
October 28, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to file under seal by All Defendants. (Rubenstein, Brian)
October 23, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Answers and for Protective Order by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rubenstein, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER granting #30 the Parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. The Parties' Stipulated Protective Order for Litigation Involving Highly Sensitive Confidential Information and Trade Secrets is approved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 10/16/2019. (NCR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for protective order by Jabil, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER appointing Jay M. Cohen as mediator; designating David Weinstein as lead counsel; setting 12/9/2019 as the mediation deadline. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/12/2019. (GSO)
September 10, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on December 9, 2019 at 9:30 am before Jay M. Cohen. (Weinstein, David)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial conference scheduled for 3/3/2021 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 11B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn; jury trial scheduled for the April 2021 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/10/2019. (GSO)
September 10, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Andrew Nicholas on behalf of Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Erik Gjovik, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Greg Ojeda, Lars Uffhausen (Nicholas, Daniel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian David Rubenstein on behalf of Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Erik Gjovik, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Greg Ojeda, Lars Uffhausen (Rubenstein, Brian)
September 3, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Jabil, Inc.. (Weinstein, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by David Matthew Allen on behalf of Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Erik Gjovik, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Greg Ojeda, Lars Uffhausen (Allen, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. McCoy on behalf of Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Erik Gjovik, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Greg Ojeda, Lars Uffhausen (McCoy, Kevin)
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Weinstein, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by All Defendants. (Dupre, Steven)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David Steinfeld is terminated as counsel of record for the Defendants and relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Attorneys Steven C. Dupr, Kevin P. McCoy, D. Matthew Allen, and David R. Wright are substituted as counsel for the Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/12/2019. (NCR)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Erik Gjovik, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Greg Ojeda, Lars Uffhausen. (Wright, David)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Defendants' motion for extension of time to file an answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants' answer is due 8/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/9/2019. (NCR)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Steinfeld, David) Modified event type on 8/8/2019 (CTR).
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Essentium, Inc. for Essentium Materials LLC.. (Steinfeld, David)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint. Defendants' answer to the Complaint is due on or before 8/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 7/24/2019. (NCR)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Jabil, Inc.. (Weinstein, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jabil, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Weinstein, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Erik Gjovik, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Greg Ojeda, Lars Uffhausen. Related case(s): no (Steinfeld, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Answer to Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Steinfeld, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David Steinfeld on behalf of Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Erik Gjovik, William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Greg Ojeda, Lars Uffhausen (Steinfeld, David)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/2/2019. (GSO)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Jabil, Inc. Civil Cover Sheet (Weinstein, David)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 1.05(e): The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. (signed by deputy clerk). (DG)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Essentium Materials LLC, Essentium, Inc., Erik Gjovik, William Terry&quo MacNeish, III, Greg Ojeda, Lars Uffhausen. (AG)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jabil, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Essentium Materials, #2 Proposed Summons Essentium, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Lars Uffhausen, #4 Proposed Summons Greg Ojeda, #5 Proposed Summons William MacNeish III)(AG)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-1567-T-23SPF. (SJB)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15632170) filed by Jabil, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Composite Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Composite Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Composite Exhibit E)(Weinstein, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jabil, Inc. v. Essentium, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Gjovik
Represented By: David Steinfeld
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Steven C. Dupre
Represented By: David Matthew Allen
Represented By: David Robert Wright
Represented By: Daniel Andrew Nicholas
Represented By: Brian David Rubenstein
Represented By: Joshua S Smith
Represented By: Thomas Folger Brink
Represented By: Paul Leon Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lars Uffhausen
Represented By: David Steinfeld
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Steven C. Dupre
Represented By: David Matthew Allen
Represented By: David Robert Wright
Represented By: Daniel Andrew Nicholas
Represented By: Brian David Rubenstein
Represented By: Joshua S Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essentium, Inc.
Represented By: David Steinfeld
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Steven C. Dupre
Represented By: David Matthew Allen
Represented By: David Robert Wright
Represented By: Daniel Andrew Nicholas
Represented By: Brian David Rubenstein
Represented By: Joshua S Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Ojeda
Represented By: David Steinfeld
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Steven C. Dupre
Represented By: David Matthew Allen
Represented By: David Robert Wright
Represented By: Daniel Andrew Nicholas
Represented By: Brian David Rubenstein
Represented By: Joshua S Smith
Represented By: Cristina Hernandez Villar
Represented By: Abbye Erika Alexander
Represented By: Bruce S. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Jack "Terry&quo MacNeish, III
Represented By: David Steinfeld
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Steven C. Dupre
Represented By: David Matthew Allen
Represented By: David Robert Wright
Represented By: Daniel Andrew Nicholas
Represented By: Brian David Rubenstein
Represented By: Joshua S Smith
Represented By: Joseph G. Riopelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essentium Materials LLC
Represented By: David Steinfeld
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Steven C. Dupre
Represented By: David Matthew Allen
Represented By: David Robert Wright
Represented By: Daniel Andrew Nicholas
Represented By: Brian David Rubenstein
Represented By: Joshua S Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Teipel
Represented By: Steven C. Dupre
Represented By: Brian David Rubenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Eichele
Represented By: William Glenn Kemper Smoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jabil, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Torres
Represented By: David Barnett Weinstein
Represented By: Jillian Margaret Askren
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jay M. Cohen
Represented By: Jay M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Manuel Menendez, Jr.
Represented By: Manuel Menendez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?