Miller et al v. Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Alice Miller and Larry Miller
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 8:2019cv01602
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service by Larry Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(CTR)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Larry Miller. Related case(s): no (LNR)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/24/2019. (TWL)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/24/2019. (TWL)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing attachments by Larry Miller re #1 Complaint (KMM)
July 10, 2019 FEES paid by Alice Miller, Larry Miller (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number TPA057249) (ARC)
July 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ENDORSED ORDER: This case was filed without payment of the filing fee or the filing of a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. The Millers have until July 19, 2019, to either pay the filing fee or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. If neither occurs, on July 19, 2019, this matter will be dismissed without prejudice and the case closed. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/6/2019. (Covington, Virginia)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service filed by Larry Miller, Alice Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?