United States of America v. Crenshaw et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Coastal States Development, LLC and Curtis A Crenshaw
Case Number: 8:2019cv01621
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 ***TERMINATED-COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO RE-FILE EACH DEFENDANTS SEPARATELY***RETURN of service executed on 08/16/2019 by United States of America as to Coastal States Development, LLC, Curtis A Crenshaw. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed)(Carroll, Allison) Modified on 8/26/2019 (CTR).
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of substitution of AUSA. Allison C. Carroll substituting for Michael W. May. (Carroll, Allison)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): Yes (May, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by United States of America. (May, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Coastal States Development, LLC, Curtis A Crenshaw. (CTR)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/5/2019. (BGS)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/5/2019. (BGS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-1621-T-36TGW. (SJB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coastal States Development, LLC, Curtis A Crenshaw filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Curtis Crenshaw, #3 Proposed Summons for Coastal States Development, LLC)(May, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Crenshaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal States Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis A Crenshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael W. May
Represented By: Allison C. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?