Sanchez v. Chronister et al
Plaintiff: Racquel Marie Sanchez
Defendant: Dean Greene, Chad Chronister and Dean Greene, II
Case Number: 8:2019cv01696
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 6/19/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 01/14/2021 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15B before Judge William F. Jung, Jury Trial set for the February 2021 trial term commencing 02/01/2021 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15B before Judge William F. Jung, Conduct mediation hearing by 8/28/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/20/2019. (SAO)
August 19, 2019 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Farmer, Matthew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Related case order and track 2 notice by Chad Chronister, Dean Greene, II. (Perotti, A.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #14 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Chad Chronister, Dean Greene, II. Related case(s): no (Perotti, A.)
July 27, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN of service executed on July 24, 2019 by Racquel Marie Sanchez as to All Parties. (Farmer, Matthew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER of service returned executed on July 22, 2019 by Racquel Marie Sanchez as to Chad Chronister. (Farmer, Matthew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER of service returned executed on July 22, 2019 by Racquel Marie Sanchez as to Dean Greene, II. (Farmer, Matthew)
July 20, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #15 Notice of pendency of related cases by Racquel Marie Sanchez. (Farmer, Matthew)
July 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #14 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Racquel Marie Sanchez. Related case(s): no (Farmer, Matthew)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/19/2019. (SAO)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS issued as to State of Florida/Department of Financial Services (BES)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS issued as to Dean Greene, II. (BES)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to Chad Chronister. (BES)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Racquel Marie Sanchez. (Farmer, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Racquel Marie Sanchez. (Farmer, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Racquel Marie Sanchez. (Farmer, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Racquel Marie Sanchez. (Farmer, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-1696-T-02SPF. (SJB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing Civil Cover Sheet by Racquel Marie Sanchez. (Farmer, Matthew) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (JNB).
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Racquel Marie Sanchez. (Farmer, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Racquel Marie Sanchez. (Farmer, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Racquel Marie Sanchez. (Farmer, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15682555) filed by Racquel Marie Sanchez.(Farmer, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Chronister et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Chronister
Represented By: A. Michael Perotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Greene, II
Represented By: A. Michael Perotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Racquel Marie Sanchez
Represented By: Matthew P. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?