Traeger Pellet Grills LLC v. Traeger, et al
Plaintiff: TRAEGER PELLET GRILLS LLC
Defendant: MARK TRAEGER, JOSEPH TRAEGER and BRIAN TRAEGER
Case Number: 8:2019cv01714
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of hearing: Miscellaneous Hearing pursuant to the Order on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 10/2/2019 at 02:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 10 A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. The parties may appear telephonically at the hearing by calling toll-free number 1-888-684-8852 on the day of the hearing and entering access code 8895301 followed by security code 1002 when prompted.(VIV)
September 11, 2019 Filing 87 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2019, Discovery due by 2/28/2020, Dispositive motions due by 3/6/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/30/2019, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/29/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli, Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 at 09:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli., Conduct mediation hearing by 3/13/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. (VIV)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ENDORSED ORDER denying #54 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. For the reasons stated in the Court's ruling on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction is hereby denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/11/2019. (VIV)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/11/2019. (VIV)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Motion to Produce. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/6/2019. (VIV)
September 3, 2019 Filing 83 JOINT MOTION for Entry of Order Governing Production of Electronically Stored Information and STIPULATION re #76 Case Management Report by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Production of Electronically Stored Information)(Conwell, George) Modified event and text on 9/4/2019 (JNB).
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/29/2019. (TWL)
August 28, 2019 Filing 81 CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Conwell, George)
August 28, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Scott N. Gamertsfelder. scottgrmr@aol.com (SNG)
August 28, 2019 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on August 26, 2019 before Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott N. Gamertsfelder, contact: scottgrmr@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 9/18/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2019. (SNG)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ENDORSED ORDER: On August 26, 2019, the parties submitted their case management report, indicating that all parties would consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. (Doc. #76). If the parties are going to agree to consent, they are directed to file their consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge by August 30, 2019, so the Magistrate Judge may weigh in on the selection of the case management and scheduling order's dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/27/2019. (MWS)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's unopposed motion to continue (Doc. #44), in light of the denial of the underlying motion and cancellation of the August 6, 2019, hearing. (Doc. # 48). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/27/2019. (MWS)
August 26, 2019 Filing 76 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Dillman, Kirk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 74 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli: MOTION HEARING held on 8/26/2019 re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. Court Reporter: Scott N. Gamertsfelder (MLJ)
August 23, 2019 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Conwell, George)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #70 Motion to allow electronic equipment. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/23/2019. (JMF)
August 23, 2019 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger, Mark Traeger identifying Other Affiliate Dansons US LLC, Other Affiliate Jeff Thiessen, Other Affiliate Dan Thiessen, Other Affiliate Jordan Thiessen, Other Affiliate 1334606 Alberta LTD (Alberta) for Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger. (Muffo, Patrick)
August 23, 2019 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically Cell Phone and Laptop Computer by Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger, Mark Traeger. (Muffo, Patrick)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Motion to allow electronic equipment. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/23/2019. (JMF)
August 22, 2019 Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically cell phone, laptop computer and tablet to Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Dkt. 6] scheduled for Monday, August 26, 2019 by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Conwell, George)
August 20, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #41 Response in Opposition to Motion by Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger, Mark Traeger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Instagram profile of gsem90, #2 Exhibit 2 - Linkedin profile of Greg Semanisin, #3 Exhibit 3 - Social Media posts of Joe Traeger)(Muffo, Patrick)
August 20, 2019 Filing 66 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Transfer filed by Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger, Mark Traeger. (Muffo, Patrick)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply to Motion to Dismiss is granted. (Doc. #64). Defendants may file a reply of no more than five pages on or before August 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/20/2019. (MWS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger, Mark Traeger. (Muffo, Patrick)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ENDORSED ORDER denying #53 motion to stay for the reasons stated at the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/20/2019. (JMF)
August 20, 2019 Filing 61 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli: MOTION HEARING held on 8/20/2019 re #53 MOTION to stay filed by Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger, Mark Traeger. (DIGITAL) (MLJ)
August 19, 2019 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in support re #6 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Alan P. Block in Support of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 1 - Definition of Useful)(Conwell, George)
August 16, 2019 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #54 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Transfer filed by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Alan Block, #2 Exh.1 - Asset Purchase Agreement, #3 Exh. 2 - Intellectual Property Rights Assignment Agreement, #4 Exh. 3 - Articles of Organization of Traeger Pellet Grills LLC, #5 Exh. 4 - Defs Charnquists and Sage Properties Corp MTD)(Conwell, George)
August 15, 2019 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION to stay filed by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Conwell, George)
August 15, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of telephonic hearing on motion re #53 MOTION to stay. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2019 at 02:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 10 A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. The parties shall appear telephonically at the hearing by calling toll-free number 1-888-684-8852 on the day of the hearing and entering access code 8895301 followed by security code 0820 when prompted.(JMF)
August 13, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. Notice of Intent to File Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 54] on an Expedited Basis. (Conwell, George)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ENDORSED ORDER referring Defendants' Renewed Motion to Stay (Doc. #53) to the Honorable Anthony E. Porcelli, United States Magistrate Judge, for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/13/2019. (MWS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 12, 2019 Mail returned as Undeliverable [Return to Sender, Attempted-Not Known, Unable to Forward] re: #25 Related case order and track 2 notice, 27 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice, 23 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice. Mail sent to Kenneth L. Wilton, Small Larkin, LLP, 10940 Wilshire Blvd, 18th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90024-3945. (Atty Address updated-Regenerated NEF) (LNR)
August 12, 2019 Mail returned as Undeliverable [Return to Sender, Attempted-Not Known, Unable to Forward] re: 36 Order no pdf. Mail sent to Kenneth L. Wilton, Small Larkin, LLP, 10940 Willshire Blvd, 18th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90024-3945. (Atty Address updated-Regenerated NEF) (LNR)
August 12, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Transfer by Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger, Mark Traeger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Asset Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - IP Rights Assignment Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Trademark Assignment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Joe Traeger Employment Agreement, #5 Affidavit of Joe Traeger, #6 Affidavit of Brian Traeger, #7 Affidavit of Mark Traeger)(Gregory, Lauren)
August 12, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to stay by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick T. Muffo, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Gregory, Lauren)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ENDORSED ORDER granting #50 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/12/2019. (Porcelli, Anthony)
August 11, 2019 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #50 MOTION for leave to file a Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by George Donovan Conwell, Jr. on behalf of Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Conwell, George)
August 9, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for leave to file a Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Conwell, George)
August 9, 2019 Filing 49 AMENDED NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #25 Related case order and track 2 notice , per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. Related case(s): yes (Conwell, George)
August 9, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Alan P. Block, appearing on behalf of Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057679.) Related document: #20 MOTION for Kirk Dillman and Alan P. Block to appear pro hac vice. (WCD)
August 9, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kirk Dillman, appearing on behalf of Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057679.) Related document: #20 MOTION for Kirk Dillman and Alan P. Block to appear pro hac vice. (WCD)
August 9, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Robert J. King, appearing on behalf of Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057679.) Related document: #37 MOTION for Robert J. King to appear pro hac vice. (WCD)
August 5, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE canceling Emergency MOTION to stay by All Defendants hearing scheduled for 8/6/2019 in light of the Court's denial of the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/5/2019. (VIV)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ENDORSED ORDER denying Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay. (Doc. #40). At this juncture, the Court does not find it necessary to stay this case in its entirety pending the outcome of Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction against Dansons US, LLC, in the District of Arizona. To the extent that Defendants desire a stay only with respect to the motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. #6), as opposed to the entire case, Defendants should seek relief tailored just to the preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/5/2019. (MWS)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the Complaint is granted. (Doc. #45). Responses to the Complaint are now due September 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/5/2019. (MWS)
August 5, 2019 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Complaint by Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger, Mark Traeger. (Muffo, Patrick)
August 5, 2019 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION to Continue re 43 Notice of hearing on motion re #40 Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Conwell, George) Modified text on 8/6/2019 (LNR).
August 2, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #40 Emergency MOTION to stay . Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2019 at 03:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 10 A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. The parties shall appear telephonically at the hearing by calling toll-free number 1-888-684-8852 on the day of the hearing and entering access code 8895301 followed by security code 0806 when prompted.(VIV)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ENDORSED ORDER granting #37 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Robert J. King may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorney G. Donovan Conwell, Jr., designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/2/2019. (VIV)
August 1, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger, Mark Traeger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Joe Traeger Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cease and Desist Letter Sent to Dansons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dansons' Response to Traeger's Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dansons.com Leadership Page, #5 Exhibit 5 - Dansons.com Brands Page, #6 Exhibit 6 - Facebook Comparison, #7 Exhibit 7 - NASCAR Announcement, #8 Exhibit 8 - Follow-up Emails to Traeger Grills, #9 Affidavit Muffo Decl, #10 Exhibit A to Muffo Decl. - Arizona Complaint, #11 Exhibit B to Muffo Decl. - Arizona Preliminary Injunction Motion, #12 Exhibit C to Muffo Decl. - Chiagouris Decl.)(Muffo, Patrick)
August 1, 2019 Filing 40 Emergency MOTION to stay by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick T. Muffo, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Muffo, Patrick)
August 1, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger, Mark Traeger. Related case(s): yes (Muffo, Patrick)
July 31, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #25 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. Related case(s): no (Conwell, George)
July 31, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Robert J. King to appear pro hac vice by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Robert J. King Certificate of Good Standing)(Conwell, George) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by August 26, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/30/2019. (MWS)
July 30, 2019 Filing 35 RETURN of service executed on 7/22/2019 by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC as to Mark Traeger. (Conwell, George)
July 30, 2019 Filing 34 RETURN of service executed on 7/18/2019 by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC as to Brian Traeger. (Conwell, George)
July 30, 2019 Filing 33 RETURN of service executed on 7/19/2019 by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC as to Joseph Traeger. (Conwell, George)
July 30, 2019 Filing 32 RETURN of service executed on 7/17/2019 by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC as to Joseph Traeger. (Conwell, George)
July 30, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Lauren M. Gregory (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057514.) Related document: #26 Unopposed MOTION for Lauren M. Gregory to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
July 30, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kenneth L. Wilton (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057514.) Related document: #24 Unopposed MOTION for Kenneth L. Wilton to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
July 30, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Patrick T. Muffo (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057514.) Related document: #22 Unopposed MOTION for Patrick T. Muffo to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
July 29, 2019 Filing 31 *** Counsel notified to re-file using the event Summons Returned Executed *** PROOF of service by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Conwell, George) Modified text and NEF regenerated on 7/30/2019 (KMM).
July 29, 2019 Filing 30 *** Counsel notified to re-file using the event Summons Returned Executed *** PROOF of service by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Conwell, George) Modified text and NEF regenerated on 7/30/2019 (KMM).
July 29, 2019 Filing 29 *** Counsel notified to re-file using the event Summons Returned Executed *** PROOF of service by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Conwell, George) Modified text and NEF regenerated on 7/30/2019 (KMM).
July 29, 2019 Filing 28 *** Counsel notified to re-file using the event Summons Returned Executed *** PROOF of service by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Conwell, George) Modified text and NEF regenerated on 7/30/2019 (KMM).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #24 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #26 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Patrick T. Muffo, Kenneth L. Wilton, and Lauren M. Gregory may appear pro hac vice on behalf of the Defendants, with Attorney William P. Cassidy, Jr. designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 7/29/2019. (VIV)
July 29, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Lauren M. Gregory to appear pro hac vice by Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger, Mark Traeger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit *** Attachment deleted- not to be filed on CM/ECF )(Cassidy, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/29/2019. (TWL)
July 29, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Kenneth L. Wilton to appear pro hac vice by Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger, Mark Traeger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit *** Attachment deleted- not to be filed on CM/ECF *** )(Cassidy, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Modified image and text on 7/30/2019 (KMM).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Kirk Dillman and Alan P. Block may appear pro hac vice on behalf of the Plaintiff, with Attorney G. Donovan Conwell, Jr. designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 7/29/2019. (VIV)
July 29, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Patrick T. Muffo to appear pro hac vice by Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger, Mark Traeger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit *** Attachment deleted- not to be filed on CM/ECF )(Cassidy, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Modified image and text on 7/30/2019 (KMM).
July 29, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by William P. Cassidy, Jr on behalf of Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger, Mark Traeger (Cassidy, William)
July 29, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Kirk Dillman and Alan P. Block to appear pro hac vice by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kirk Dillman Certificate of Good Standing from California State Bar, #2 Exhibit Alan P. Block - Certificate of Good Standing from California State Bar)(Conwell, George) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice #16 Motion for clarification. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 7/22/2019. (VIV)
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #16 MOTION for clarification re #15 Order Setting Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc 6) by George Donovan Conwell, Jr on behalf of Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Conwell, George)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of counsel for Traeger Pellet Grills LLC's Certificate of Service by George Donovan Conwell, Jr on behalf of Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Conwell, George) Modified on 7/22/2019 COUNSEL refiling with correct case number (BES).
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for clarification re #15 Order Setting Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc 6) by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Conwell, George)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law : Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2019 at 02:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 10 A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 7/18/2019. (VIV)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS issued as to Brian Traeger, Joseph Traeger, Mark Traeger. (KMM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. ( Attachment(s) #1 Complaint part 1, #2 Complaint part 2) (KMM).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Plaintiff Traeger Pellet Grills, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #6) is referred to the Honorable Anthony E. Porcelli, United States Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), for an evidentiary hearing and the issuance of a Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/17/2019. (MWS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Conwell, George) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (KMM).
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Larry Chiagorous re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-list of the primary sources re formulating my opinions, #2 Exhibit 2-Chiagouris complete curriculum vitae, #3 Exhibit 3-list of the current Traeger product line, #4 Exhibit 4-list of trade show related activity by the Traeger organization, #5 Exhibit 5-Traeger Grills blog entries summarized since 2015, #6 Exhibit 6-summary of all of the reviews found on Amazon.com for Traeger Grills, #7 Exhibit 7-synopsis of a sample of the articles that have referenced the Traeger brand of products, #8 Exhibit 8-table referencing Traeger Grills brand as Traegering)(Conwell, George) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (KMM).
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-1714-T-33AEP. (SJB)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Robert J. King re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joe Traeger joins Louisiana Grills, #2 Exhibit B - Founders Series __ Web-Site, #3Exhibit C - Dansons Instagram Facebook and Twitter post screenshots)(Conwell, George) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (KMM).
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Thomas Burton re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - TII website - Traeger Industries Company information - Pellet Barbecue Grills, #2 Exhibit 2 -Traeger Wood Pellet Grills, #3 Exhibit 3 - TII Website - Pellet Barbecue Grills Traeger Industries in Mt Angel, #4 Exhibit 4 - Asset Purchase Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - IP Rights Assignment Agreement)(Conwell, George) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (KMM).
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Conwell, George) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (KMM).
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC . (Conwell, George) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (KMM).*** refiled at DE# 11 ***
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Conwell, George) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (KMM). *** Refiled at DE# 11 ***
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Conwell, George) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (KMM). *** Refiled at DE# 11 ***
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Traeger Pellet Grills LLC by re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Conwell, George) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (KMM).
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against Joseph Traeger, Brian Traeger and Mark Traeger with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15692570) filed by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - IP Rights Assignment Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - TII Website - Pellet Barbecue Grills Traeger Industries in Mt Angel, #3 Exhibit 3 - TII website - Traeger Industries Company information - Pellet Barbecue Grills, #4 Exhibit 4 - Traeger TM Registration, #5 Exhibit 5 - Active Traeger Registered Trademarks, #6 Exhibit 6 - Asset Purchase Agreement, #7 Exhibit 7 - Joe Traeger joins Louisiana Grills, #8 Exhibit 8 - Founders Series __ Web-Site, #9 Exhibit 9 - Dansons Instagram Facebook, and Twitter post screenshots)(Conwell, George) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (KMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Traeger Pellet Grills LLC v. Traeger, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK TRAEGER
Represented By: William P. Cassidy, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth L. Wilton
Represented By: Lauren M. Gregory
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Muffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH TRAEGER
Represented By: William P. Cassidy, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth L. Wilton
Represented By: Lauren M. Gregory
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Muffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN TRAEGER
Represented By: William P. Cassidy, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth L. Wilton
Represented By: Lauren M. Gregory
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Muffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAEGER PELLET GRILLS LLC
Represented By: George Donovan Conwell, Jr.
Represented By: Alan P. Block
Represented By: Robert J. King
Represented By: Kirk Dillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?