Chandler v. Charter Communications
Plaintiff: Carol Chandler
Defendant: Charter Communications
Case Number: 8:2019cv01715
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER dismissing case, with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/4/2019. (BGS)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Carol Chandler. (Gear, Trescot)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by 9/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 8/8/2019. (BEE)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Defendant by Carol Chandler. (Gear, Trescot) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Trescot Joseph Gear on behalf of Carol Chandler (Gear, Trescot)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Carol Chandler. (Gear, Trescot)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Carol Chandler. Related case(s): No (Gear, Trescot)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/6/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/23/2019. (BGS)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/6/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/23/2019. (BGS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Charter Communications. (CTR)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-1715-T-36AAS. (SJB)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charter Communications with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15692335) filed by Carol Chandler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Notices of Right to Sue)(Gear, Trescot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler v. Charter Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Chandler
Represented By: Trescot Joseph Gear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?