Juda et al v. United Van Lines LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Juda and Mary Juda
Defendant: United Van Lines LLC, Suddath Relocation Systems of St. Petersburg, Inc., Suddath Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company and Suddath Companies
Case Number: 8:2019cv01718
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 49:14706
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by United Van Lines LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4)(Rine, John)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #19 Defendant United Van Lines LLC's Motion For Leave to File Reply. Defendant United Van Lines LLC shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to file its reply, which shall not exceed ten (10) pages. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/5/2019. (GMD)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Defendant Vanliner's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #14 in light of the Parties' stipulation of dismissal of Defendant Vanliner and this Court's Order of Dismissal of Vanliner ONLY. #27 #29. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/3/2019. (Scriven, Mary)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 12/14/2020. Conduct mediation by 4/22/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. This matter is set on the JUNE 2021 TRIAL CALENDAR, which commences on June 7, 2021, with a more precise date to follow. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/3/2019. (GMD)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Vanliner Insurance Company ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/28/2019. (GMD)
August 28, 2019 Filing 28 First MOTION for leave to file Leave to File Reply Brief Supporting Motion to Dismiss Of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Suddath Companies, Suddath Relocation Systems of St. Petersburg, Inc., Suddath Van Lines, Inc.. (McMahon, James)
August 23, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION re #14 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim between Plaintiffs and Vanliner by Mary Juda, Richard Juda. (Pucci, Patrice)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 8/22/2019. (Wilson, Thomas)
August 22, 2019 Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Rine, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically to Complete Case Management Report by United Van Lines LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rine, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 21, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Mary Juda, Richard Juda. (Pucci, Patrice)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #21 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Vanliner's and Suddath's Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including August 23, 2019 to respond to Defendant Vanliner and Defendant Suddath's respective Motions. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/16/2019. (GMD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , #13 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Mary Juda, Richard Juda. (Pucci, Patrice)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Mary Juda, Richard Juda. (Pucci, Patrice)
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to file Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss by United Van Lines LLC. (Rine, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Vanliner Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent National Interstate Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Great American Insurance Group, Other Affiliate American Financial Group, Inc. for Vanliner Insurance Company.. (Roth, Heidi)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by United Van Lines LLC identifying Corporate Parent Transportation Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent UniGroup, C. A. for United Van Lines LLC.. (Rine, John)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Suddath Companies, Suddath Relocation Systems of St. Petersburg, Inc., Suddath Van Lines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Suddath Companies for Suddath Companies, Suddath Relocation Systems of St. Petersburg, Inc., Suddath Van Lines, Inc... (McMahon, James)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #11 the Joint Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE Attorney James Scott McMahon as counsel of record and recipient of filings for Defendant Vanliner Insurance Company. Heidi M. Roth, of the Law Offices of Heidi M. Roth, P.A., will represent Defendant Vanliner in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/6/2019. (GMD) Modified on 8/6/2019. (GMD)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Vanliner Insurance Company. (Roth, Heidi)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Suddath Companies, Suddath Relocation Systems of St. Petersburg, Inc., Suddath Van Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Bill of Lading, #3 Exhibit Warehouse Contract)(McMahon, James)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint as to United Van Lines filed by Mary Juda, Richard Juda. (Pucci, Patrice)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by Vanliner Insurance Company. (Roth, Heidi)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Mary Juda, Richard Juda. Related case(s): Yes (Pucci, Patrice)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by United Van Lines LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Rine, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by United Van Lines LLC of filing Civil Cover Sheet (Rine, John)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #5 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension to Respond to Amended Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including August 5, 2019 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint, (Dkt. 1-5). Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/23/2019. (GMD)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Suddath Companies, Suddath Relocation Systems of St. Petersburg, Inc., Suddath Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (McMahon, James).
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Suddath Companies, Suddath Relocation Systems of St. Petersburg, Inc., Suddath Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pending Motions Agreed Motion for Extension)(McMahon, James)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/19/2019. (KTT)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel to file Civil Cover Sheet. (LD)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-1718-T-35TGW. (SJB)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixth Judicial Circuit of Florida, case number 19-000894-CI filed in State Court on 2/4/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15694434 filed by United Van Lines LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 State Court COMPLAINT, #5 State Court COMPLAINT, #6 State Court Other Documents Summons, #7 State Court Other Documents Summons, #8 State Court Other Documents Summons, #9 State Court Other Documents Summons, #10 State Court Other Documents Notice of Appearance, #11 State Court Pending Motions Extension of Time)(Rine, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juda et al v. United Van Lines LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Van Lines LLC
Represented By: John Austin Rine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suddath Relocation Systems of St. Petersburg, Inc.
Represented By: James Scott McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suddath Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: James Scott McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanliner Insurance Company
Represented By: James Scott McMahon
Represented By: Heidi M. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suddath Companies
Represented By: James Scott McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Juda
Represented By: Patrice Anne Pucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Juda
Represented By: Patrice Anne Pucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?