Buzz Pop Cocktails Corporation v. Booze Pops LLC
Plaintiff: Buzz Pop Cocktails Corporation
Defendant: Booze Pops LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01840
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. In light of Plaintiff's having filed an Amended Complaint as a matter of course, Plaintiff's motion is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/17/2019. (SBA)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Standing, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted, and Motion to Strike Request for Punitive Damages and Patent Allegations. In light of Plaintiff's having filed an Amended Complaint as a matter of course, Defendant's motion is denied as moot. Defendant shall be free to reassert any of the challenges raised therein to the extent that they remain viable against the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/17/2019. (SBA)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Buzz Pop Cocktails Corporation. (Reiner, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and lack of standing MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue Updated Rule 3.01(g) Certification by David P. Reiner, II on behalf of Buzz Pop Cocktails Corporation (Reiner, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Booze Pops LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Buzz Pop Cocktails Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Reiner, David)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and lack of standing MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue by Buzz Pop Cocktails Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiner, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Booze Pops LLC. (Latham, Susan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and lack of standing, MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue by Booze Pops LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Articles of Incorporation_Buzz Pop Cocktails Corp._12-7-2019), #2 Affidavit (Exhibit 2_Affidavit of Woodrow Norris), #3 Exhibit (Plaintiff's Abandonment of Patent Application; USPTO Public PAIR docket))(Latham, Susan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 8/6/2019 by Buzz Pop Cocktails Corporation as to Booze Pops LLC. (Reiner, David)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Booze Pops LLC. (LD)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (LD)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-1840-T-35TGW. (SJB)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Booze Pops LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15737748) filed by Buzz Pop Cocktails Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Reiner, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buzz Pop Cocktails Corporation v. Booze Pops LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buzz Pop Cocktails Corporation
Represented By: David P. Reiner, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booze Pops LLC
Represented By: Susan Joy Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?