Mason v. Central Research Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marcellus M. Mason, Jr.
Defendant: Central Research Inc., Equifax Inc., Experian, Trans Union LLC and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01847
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to Central Research Inc., Equifax Inc., Experian, Trans Union, LLC. (LNR)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 construed Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and granting #3 Motion for an Order Directing Service by the United States Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/3/2019. (AMM)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER: On the basis of #8 Plaintiff's response, the Court's Show Cause Order dated August 23, 2019, is hereby discharged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/3/2019. (AMM)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 Order to show cause filed by Marcellus M. Mason, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LNR)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ***DISCHARGED, pursuant to court's endorsed order 9.*** ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Marcellus M. Mason, Jr. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, the Plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, why this case should not be dismissed or transferred to the Southern District of Florida's Fort Pierce Division or some other appropriate venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/23/2019. (AHA) Modified text on 9/4/2019 (LNR).
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Marcellus M. Mason, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LNR)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Marcellus M. Mason, Jr. Related case(s): no (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LNR)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/1/2019. (SAO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for an order directing service by the United States Marshal by Marcellus M. Mason, Jr. (AG)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcellus M. Mason, Jr. (AG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Research Inc., Equifax Inc., Experian, Trans Union LLC with Jury Demand filed by Marcellus M. Mason, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Central Research Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Equifax Inc., #4 Proposed Summons Trans Union LLC, #5 Proposed Summons Experian, #6 Mailing Envelope)(AG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Central Research Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Research Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcellus M. Mason, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?