Biomedical Research & Development, Inc v. Ustar Beauty, Inc
Plaintiff: Biomedical Research & Development, Inc
Defendant: Ustar Beauty, Inc
Case Number: 8:2019cv01896
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Biomedical Research & Development, Inc. Related case(s): No (Fisher, Arthur)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Biomedical Research & Development, Inc. (Fisher, Arthur)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/20/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/6/2019. (JCG)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/20/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/6/2019. (JCG)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibits) (BES)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Ustar Beauty, Inc. (BES)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ustar Beauty, Inc Filing fee $ 08/02/2019, receipt number TPA 057566 filed by Biomedical Research & Development, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits)(BES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biomedical Research & Development, Inc v. Ustar Beauty, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ustar Beauty, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biomedical Research & Development, Inc
Represented By: Robert Michael DeLoach
Represented By: Arthur W. Fisher, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?