Waymo LLC v. Waymo LLC
Plaintiff: Waymo LLC, a Delaware company and Waymo LLC
Defendant: Waymo LLC, a Florida company
Case Number: 8:2019cv01904
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 9/24/2019 by Waymo LLC as to Waymo LLC. (Fischer, Ury)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Waymo LLC identifying Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate Waymo Holding Inc., Other Affiliate OB Technology Holdings Inc. for Waymo LLC.. (Fischer, Ury)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Waymo LLC. Related case(s): No (Fischer, Ury)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (CTR)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Waymo LLC. (CTR)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/5/2019. (BGS)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/5/2019. (BGS)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-1904-T-36AEP. (SJB)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Waymo LLC, a Delaware company identifying Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate Waymo Holding Inc. for Waymo LLC, a Delaware company.. (Fischer, Ury)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Waymo LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15762520) filed by Waymo LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Fischer, Ury) Modified on 8/5/2019 (CTR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waymo LLC v. Waymo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waymo LLC, a Florida company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waymo LLC, a Delaware company
Represented By: Ury Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waymo LLC
Represented By: Ury Fischer
Represented By: William C. Rava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?