Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Glassco Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co., Geico Indemnity Co. and Geico General Insurance Company
Defendant: John Bailey, Jason Wilemon, Glassco Inc. and Andrew Victor
Case Number: 8:2019cv01950
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #25 Motion to dismiss filed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Marino, John)
September 30, 2019 Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Marino, John)
September 30, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #26 Motion for order to show cause /to Revoke Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Marino, John)
September 26, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for order to show cause re: Pro Hac Vice Admission by Glassco Inc.. (Laurato, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by Andrew Victor. (Germain, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by John Bailey. Related case(s): yes (Levine, Howard)
September 10, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #16 Motion to dismiss (Jason Wilemon) filed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Marino, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #18 Motion to dismiss (John Bailey) filed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Marino, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #14 Motion to dismiss (Glassco Inc.) filed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Marino, John)
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #12 Notice of pendency of related cases, #5 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Glassco Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Laurato, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Glassco Inc.. (Laurato, Michael)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by John Bailey. (Levine, Howard)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Jerome Levine on behalf of John Bailey (Levine, Howard)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Jason Wilemon. (Anthony, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Anthony on behalf of Jason Wilemon (Anthony, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Glassco Inc.. (Laurato, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Vincent Laurato on behalf of Glassco Inc. (Laurato, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Order Regarding Notice of Track Designation per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Related case(s): no (Marino, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co... (Marino, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 8/8/19 by Government Employees Insurance Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co. as to Jason Wilemon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Jason Wilemon)(Marino, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 8/14/19 by Government Employees Insurance Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co. as to Andrew Victor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Andrew Victor)(Marino, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 8/8/2019 by Government Employees Insurance Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co. as to Glassco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for GLASSCO INC.)(Marino, John)
August 19, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Yonatan Bernstein, appearing on behalf of Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057818.) Related document: #6 MOTION for Yonatan Bernstein to appear pro hac vice. (WCD)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Plaintiffs' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 8/15/2019. (JAR)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Yonatan Bernstein to appear pro hac vice by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Special Admission Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Marino, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/8/2019. (GSO)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to John Bailey, Glassco Inc., Andrew Victor, Jason Wilemon. (CTR)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-1950-T-23JSS. (SJB)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Bailey, Glassco Inc., Andrew Victor, Jason Wilemon with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15776511) filed by Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Marino, John) Modified on 8/7/2019 (CTR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Glassco Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co.
Represented By: Yonatan M. Bernstein
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Co.
Represented By: Yonatan M. Bernstein
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico General Insurance Company
Represented By: Yonatan M. Bernstein
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bailey
Represented By: Howard Jerome Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Wilemon
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glassco Inc.
Represented By: Michael Vincent Laurato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Victor
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?