Certified Collectibles Group, LLC et al v. Globant, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Numismatic Guaranty Corporation of America, Paper Money Guaranty LLC, Certified Guaranty Company LLC, Certified Collectibles Group, LLC and Paper Money Guaranty, LLC
Defendant: Globant S.A. and Globant, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01962
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #22 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , #19 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Responses due on or before 10/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 10/3/2019. (REE)
October 2, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by Certified Collectibles Group, LLC, Certified Guaranty Company LLC, Numismatic Guaranty Corporation of America, Paper Money Guaranty, LLC. (Ruiz, Maria)
September 30, 2019 Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ruiz, Maria)
September 19, 2019 Filing 25 JOINDER in motion by Globant S.A. re #19 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Globant, LLC . (Phillips, J.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Alejandro Scannapieco re #22 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by Globant S.A.. (Phillips, J.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Sol Noello re #22 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by Globant S.A.. (Phillips, J.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by Globant S.A.. (Phillips, J.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Globant, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Globant Espaa S.A., Other Affiliate Globant S.A. for Globant, LLC.. (Phillips, J.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Fredrick H.L. McClure re #19 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Globant, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Phillips, J.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Globant, LLC. (Phillips, J.)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on 9/4/2019 by Paper Money Guaranty, LLC, Certified Collectibles Group, LLC, Certified Guaranty Company LLC, Numismatic Guaranty Corporation of America as to Globant S.A. (Epstein, R.) Modified on 9/17/2019 (DG).
September 17, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 8/9/2019 by Paper Money Guaranty, LLC, Certified Collectibles Group, LLC, Certified Guaranty Company LLC, Numismatic Guaranty Corporation of America as to Globant, LLC. (Epstein, R.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of compliance re 13 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Certified Collectibles Group, LLC, Certified Guaranty Company LLC, Numismatic Guaranty Corporation of America, Paper Money Guaranty, LLC (Epstein, R.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of compliance re 13 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Certified Collectibles Group, LLC, Certified Guaranty Company LLC, Numismatic Guaranty Corporation of America, Paper Money Guaranty, LLC (Ressler, Mark)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Defendants have up to and including September 19, 2019, within which to respond to the Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/28/2019. (VIV)
August 27, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney R. Tali Epstein (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057908.) Related document: #11 MOTION for R. Tali Epstein to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
August 27, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Mark P. Ressler (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057908.) Related document: #9 MOTION for Mark P. Ressler to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Mark P. Ressler and R. Tali Epstein may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Certified Collectibles Group, LLC, Numismatic Guaranty Corporation of America, Certified Guaranty Company LLC and Paper Money Guaranty, LLC (collectively, "CCG"), with Attorney Maria H. Ruiz designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/27/2019. (VIV)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 Written designation and consent to act by Maria Helena Ruiz on behalf of Certified Collectibles Group, LLC, Certified Guaranty Company LLC, Numismatic Guaranty Corporation of America, Paper Money Guaranty, LLC. Local Counsel: Maria H. Ruiz. Non-Resident Counsel: R. Tali Epstein. (Ruiz, Maria)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for R. Tali Epstein to appear pro hac vice by Certified Collectibles Group, LLC, Certified Guaranty Company LLC, Numismatic Guaranty Corporation of America, Paper Money Guaranty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ruiz, Maria) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 Written designation and consent to act by Maria Helena Ruiz on behalf of Certified Collectibles Group, LLC, Certified Guaranty Company LLC, Numismatic Guaranty Corporation of America, Paper Money Guaranty, LLC. Local Counsel: Maria H. Ruiz. Non-Resident Counsel: Mark P. Ressler. (Ruiz, Maria)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Mark P. Ressler to appear pro hac vice by Certified Collectibles Group, LLC, Certified Guaranty Company LLC, Numismatic Guaranty Corporation of America, Paper Money Guaranty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ruiz, Maria) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Globant S.A., Globant, LLC. (Phillips, J.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Certified Collectibles Group, LLC, Certified Guaranty Company LLC, Numismatic Guaranty Corporation of America, Paper Money Guaranty, LLC. Related case(s): No (Ruiz, Maria)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/9/2019. (GSO)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Globant S.A., Globant, LLC. (DG)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Certified Collectibles Group, LLC, Certified Guaranty Company LLC, Numismatic Guaranty Corporation of America, Paper Money Guaranty LLC. (Ruiz, Maria)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-1962-T-23AEP. (SJB)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Globant S.A., Globant, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15783100) filed by Paper Money Guaranty LLC, Certified Collectibles Group, LLC, Certified Guaranty Company LLC, Numismatic Guaranty Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Ruiz, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certified Collectibles Group, LLC et al v. Globant, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Numismatic Guaranty Corporation of America
Represented By: Maria Helena Ruiz
Represented By: R. Tali Epstein
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paper Money Guaranty LLC
Represented By: Maria Helena Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certified Guaranty Company LLC
Represented By: Maria Helena Ruiz
Represented By: R. Tali Epstein
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certified Collectibles Group, LLC
Represented By: Maria Helena Ruiz
Represented By: R. Tali Epstein
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paper Money Guaranty, LLC
Represented By: Maria Helena Ruiz
Represented By: R. Tali Epstein
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globant S.A.
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globant, LLC
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?