Dexter v. Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: Rashaad Dexter
Defendant: Walgreen Co and Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01982
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #12 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and lack of jurisdiction Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer by Rashaad Dexter. (Papas, Constantine)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in support re #12 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and lack of jurisdiction filed by Walgreen Co.. (Ortiz, Maria)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and lack of jurisdiction by Walgreen Co.. (Ortiz, Maria)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Walgreen Co.'s answer or response is due by 9/26/2019. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 9/5/2019. (SMB)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Walgreen Co.. (Ortiz, Maria)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 8/15/2019 by Rashaad Dexter as to Walgreen Co.. (Papas, Constantine)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice by Rashaad Dexter. (Papas, Constantine)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Rashaad Dexter. Related case(s): no (Papas, Constantine)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/16/2019. (KAC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Walgreen Co. (LSS)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-1982-T-30CPT. (SJB)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Rashaad Dexter. (Papas, Constantine)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Rashaad Dexter re #1 Complaint (Papas, Constantine)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walgreen Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15791662) filed by Rashaad Dexter.(Papas, Constantine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dexter v. Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashaad Dexter
Represented By: Constantine W. Papas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Maria D. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?