Jannicelli v. Bayview Loan Servicing , LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edward J Jannicelli and Edward J. Jannicelli
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for the Certificate Holders CWALT and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 8:2019cv02036
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to October 22, 2019 to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 10/1/2019. (SMB)
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Respond to Complaint by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Evans, Dale)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Edward J. Jannicelli. (Goodall, Rebbecca)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants' answer or response is due by 10/2/2019. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 9/10/2019. (SMB)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Evans, Dale)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. Related case(s): yes (Evans, Dale)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon; Corporate Parent Bayview Asset Management, LLC for Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Evans, Dale)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Edward J. Jannicelli re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Goodall, Rebbecca)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Edward J. Jannicelli. Related case(s): no (Goodall, Rebbecca)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale A. Evans, Jr on behalf of Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon (Evans, Dale)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan I. Herbert on behalf of Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon (Herbert, Brendan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Edward J. Jannicelli re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Goodall, Rebbecca)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (BSN)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Rebecca Ann Goodall of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BSN)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/16/2019. (KAC)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-2036-T-30TGW. (SJB)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15812205) filed by Edward J Jannicelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through P, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Goodall, Rebbecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jannicelli v. Bayview Loan Servicing , LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Dale A. Evans, Jr.
Represented By: Brendan I. Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for the Certificate Holders CWALT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Dale A. Evans, Jr.
Represented By: Brendan I. Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J Jannicelli
Represented By: Rebbecca Ann Goodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. Jannicelli
Represented By: Rebbecca Ann Goodall
Represented By: Andrew M. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?