Roe v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Administrator GREGORY S ROE and Gregory S. Roe
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc. and Nissan Motor Company, LTD.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02052
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Telephonically. The parties may appear by telephone at the case management conference for the purpose of filing their joint Case Management Report. In the event that the parties fail to agree upon necessary terms of the Case Management Report, the Court may direct that they conduct a second conference in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 10/7/2019. (MLM)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Telephonically Rule 26 Conference by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Rudock, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Nissan North America, Inc.(Fender, Loren) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (JNB).
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 8-21-19 by Gregory S. Roe as to Nissan Motor Company, LTD. (Richards, Darryl)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 8-21-19 by Gregory S. Roe as to Nissan North America, Inc. (Richards, Darryl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 (TERMINATED: Incorrect filing event used; counsel to re-file) PROOF of service by Gregory S. Roe (Attachments: #1 Main Document)(Richards, Darryl) Modified on 8/27/2019 (AG).
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 8/21/2019. (SRC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Nissan Motor Company, LTD., Nissan North America, Inc. (JNB)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-2052-T-60AAS. (NAS)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15815130) filed by GREGORY S ROE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Richards, Darryl) Modified on 8/19/2019 to add receipt number (NAS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Administrator GREGORY S ROE
Represented By: Darryl R. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory S. Roe
Represented By: Darryl R. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Loren W. Fender
Represented By: Robert John Rudock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Company, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?