Hurvitz v. Stadium Inc., et al
Plaintiff: DAVID L HURVITZ and David L. Hurvitz
Defendant: SYNERGETIC COMMUNICATION INC., VT INC. AS TRUSTEE OF WORLD OMNI LT, WORLD OMNI FINANCIAL CORP. D/B/A SOUTHEAST TOYOTA FINANCE, STADIUM INC. D/B/A STADIUM TOYOTA, VT Inc., Stadium Inc. and World Omni Financial Corp.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02117
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Pursuant to the Closed End Motor Vehicle Lease Agreement, the Parties are compelled to arbitrate Plaintiff's claims against Defendants. This case is stayed pending the arbitration of Plaintiff's claims against Defendants. The parties shall file a notice informing the Court that the arbitration has been concluded, or that their dispute has otherwise been resolved, within ten days of either of such events. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and deadlines and administratively close this file. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/11/2019. (BGS)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by David L. Hurvitz (Dunivan, Bryant)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Stadium Inc., Synergetic Communication Inc., VT Inc., World Omni Financial Corp. identifying Corporate Parent JM Family Enterprises, Inc. for World Omni Financial Corp... (Roman, Ryan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to compel arbitration by Stadium Inc., Synergetic Communication Inc., VT Inc., World Omni Financial Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Lease Agreement))(Roman, Ryan)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/6/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/23/2019. (BGS)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/6/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/23/2019. (BGS)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-2117-T-36AEP. (SJB)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 13th Judicial Cir., Hillsborough County, FL, case number 19-CC-041217 filed in State Court on July 30, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15836285 filed by VT INC. AS TRUSTEE OF WORLD OMNI LT, WORLD OMNI FINANCIAL CORP. D/B/A SOUTHEAST TOYOTA FINANCE, STADIUM INC. D/B/A STADIUM TOYOTA, SYNERGETIC COMMUNICATION INC.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roman, Ryan) Modified on 8/23/2019 (CTR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurvitz v. Stadium Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNERGETIC COMMUNICATION INC.
Represented By: Ryan Alan Roman
Represented By: Michael Constantine Marsh
Represented By: Octavia Monique Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VT INC. AS TRUSTEE OF WORLD OMNI LT
Represented By: Ryan Alan Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLD OMNI FINANCIAL CORP. D/B/A SOUTHEAST TOYOTA FINANCE
Represented By: Ryan Alan Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STADIUM INC. D/B/A STADIUM TOYOTA
Represented By: Ryan Alan Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VT Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Alan Roman
Represented By: Michael Constantine Marsh
Represented By: Octavia Monique Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stadium Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Alan Roman
Represented By: Michael Constantine Marsh
Represented By: Octavia Monique Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Omni Financial Corp.
Represented By: Ryan Alan Roman
Represented By: Michael Constantine Marsh
Represented By: Octavia Monique Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID L HURVITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Hurvitz
Represented By: Bryant Dunivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?