Dish Network L.L.C. et al v. One Box TV, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nagrastar LLC and Dish Network L.L.C.
Defendant: One Box TV, LLC and Donna Fogle
Case Number: 8:2019cv02147
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Damages Discovery. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 10/21/2019. (NCR)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kevin McMonnies, #2 Exhibit)(Boatman, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to One Box TV, LLC (LSS)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Donna Fogle (LSS)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Donna Fogle, One Box TV, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James A. Boatman, Jr.)(Boatman, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 9/3/2019 by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC as to One Box TV, LLC. (Boatman, James)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 8/29/2019 by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC as to Donna Fogle. (Boatman, James) Modified date of service on 9/5/2019 (LSS).
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC. Related case(s): no (Boatman, James)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/29/2019. (KAC)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Donna Fogle, One Box TV, LLC. (LSS)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-2147-T-30SPF. (SJB)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC identifying Corporate Parent DISH Network Corporation, Corporate Parent DISH DBS Corporation, Other Affiliate The Boatman Law Firm PA for Dish Network L.L.C.; Corporate Parent EchoStar Corporation, Corporate Parent Kudelski SA, Corporate Parent Nagra USA, Inc., Other Affiliate The Boatman Law Firm PA for Nagrastar LLC.. (Boatman, James)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15853327) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Boatman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dish Network L.L.C. et al v. One Box TV, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagrastar LLC
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dish Network L.L.C.
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Box TV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Fogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?