Michon v. Judd et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Michon
Defendant: Polk County Sheriff's Office and Grady C. Judd, Jr.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02189
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing the action without prejudice; directing the clerk to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/29/2019. (BK)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the clerk to SEND to Michon a Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate form; directing Michon, by 10/21/2019, either to file the fully completed form or to pay the $400 fee. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/5/2019. (BK)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. (GSO)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grady C. Judd, Jr., Polk County Sheriff's Office filed by Matthew Michon. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(DG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michon v. Judd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polk County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady C. Judd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Michon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?