Lopez v. United States
Plaintiff: Milaida Ivette Lopez
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2019cv02194
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Milaida Ivette Lopez. Related case(s): No (Trentalange, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Milaida Ivette Lopez identifying Other Affiliate Trentalange & Kelley, P.A., Other Affiliate Michael J. Trentalange for Milaida Ivette Lopez. (Trentalange, Michael) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (JNB).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/18/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/4/2019. (JCG)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/18/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/4/2019. (JCG)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JNB)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-2194-T-35SPF. (SJB)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15870452) filed by Milaida Ivette Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Trentalange, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milaida Ivette Lopez
Represented By: Michael J. Trentalange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?