Knopp v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Ada Knopp and Aida Knopp
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Not Yet Classified: Jack L. Townsend, Sr.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02303
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Bench Trial set for September 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/13/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/24/2019. (MWS)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Coffman, William)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are directed to adhere to the Court's Scheduling Order. This action is hereby referred to Jack L. Townsend, Sr., Esq., for mediation. Lead Counsel shall file the jointly-prepared Case Management Report by December 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/4/2019. (TWL)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Juan, Brooke)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Juan, Brooke)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Aida Knopp. (Coffman, William)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Aida Knopp. Related case(s): n (Coffman, William)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 09-19-2019 by Aida Knopp as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Coffman, William)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/23/2019. (TWL)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/23/2019. (TWL)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (LNR)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-2303-T-33CPT. (SJB)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15924459) filed by Aida Knopp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Coffman, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knopp v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Brooke Chastain Juan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Knopp
Represented By: William S. Coffman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aida Knopp
Represented By: William S. Coffman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Jack L. Townsend, Sr.
Represented By: Jack Light Townsend, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?