Grier v. Section 8 Tampa Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: Hassanna Grier
Defendant: Section 8 Tampa Housing Authority, Ramesh Mehta and Cynthia Oster
Case Number: 8:2019cv02503
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Plaintiff shall have up to and including December 20, 2019 to file a second amended complaint. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 11/8/2019. (JMF)
October 24, 2019 Mail returned as Undeliverable [Return to Sender, Attempted-Not Known, Unable to Forward] re: #3 Related case order and track 2 notice. Mail sent to Hassanna Grier, 1111 E. Eskimo Ave Apt B, Tampa, FL 33604, Unable to Re-send. (LNR)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ramesh Mehta, Cynthia Oster, Section 8 Tampa Housing Authority filed by Hassanna Grier.(LNR)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/10/2019. (SAO)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Hassanna Grier. (LNR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ramesh Mehta, Cynthia Oster, Section 8 Tampa Housing Authority filed by Hassanna Grier.(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grier v. Section 8 Tampa Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Section 8 Tampa Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramesh Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassanna Grier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?