Phillips v. Hillsborough Area Regional Transit Authority
Plaintiff: ZACHARY PHILLIPS
Defendant: Hillsborough Area Regional Transit Authority
Case Number: 8:2019cv02504
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:794
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Townsend, Cindy)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/13/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/30/2019. (MR)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/13/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/30/2019. (MR)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Zachary Phillips. (Smith, Donna)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Zachary Phillips. Related case(s): yes (Smith, Donna)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 10/23/2019. (Flynn, Sean)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Hillsborough Area Regional Transit Authority. (Townsend, Cindy)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Hillsborough Area Regional Transit Authority. (Townsend, Cindy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Hillsborough Area Regional Transit Authority. Related case(s): No (Townsend, Cindy)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hillsborough Area Regional Transit Authority.(Townsend, Cindy)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy Ann Townsend on behalf of Hillsborough Area Regional Transit Authority (Townsend, Cindy)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-2504-T-35SPF. (SJB)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Hillsborough Area Regional Transit Authority re #1 Notice of Removal of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Townsend, Cindy)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, case number 19-CA-9344 filed in State Court on 9/10/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16010843 filed by Hillsborough Area Regional Transit Authority. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT)(Townsend, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Hillsborough Area Regional Transit Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough Area Regional Transit Authority
Represented By: Cindy Ann Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACHARY PHILLIPS
Represented By: Donna V. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?