Global Sports Alliance, Inc. v. United States Specialty Sports Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: Global Sports Alliance, Inc.
Defendant: United States Specialty Sports Association, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02508
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 10/15/19 by Global Sports Alliance, Inc. as to United States Specialty Sports Association, Inc.. (Fee, Richard)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion and Memorandum of Law to Dismiss the Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff must respond to #12 the motion by December 9, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 12/2/2019. (JAR)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State A Claim by Global Sports Alliance, Inc.. (Fee, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by United States Specialty Sports Association, Inc.. (German, John)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State A Claim by United States Specialty Sports Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(German, John)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendant must respond to #1 the Complaint by November 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 11/6/2019. (JAR)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by United States Specialty Sports Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(German, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Modified event type on 11/6/2019 (CTR).
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Cody German on behalf of United States Specialty Sports Association, Inc. (German, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Global Sports Alliance, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Fee, Richard)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Global Sports Alliance, Inc.. (Fee, Richard)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/24/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/10/2019. (BGS)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/24/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/10/2019. (BGS)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (CTR)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to United States Specialty Sports Association, Inc. (CTR)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-2508-T-36JSS. (SJB)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial (Injunctive Relief Sought) against United States Specialty Sports Association, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16013265) filed by Global Sports Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Fee, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Sports Alliance, Inc. v. United States Specialty Sports Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Sports Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Edson Fee
Represented By: Kathleen M. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Specialty Sports Association, Inc.
Represented By: John Cody German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?