Coykendall v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Joshua Rowland Coykendall
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2019cv02567
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 07/23/2010. (JNB)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF of service by Joshua Rowland Coykendall (Jackson, Douglas)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Joshua Rowland Coykendall. Related case(s): Yes (Jackson, Douglas)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BES)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Joshua Rowland Coykendall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Jackson, Douglas)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/18/2019. (SAO)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Joshua Rowland Coykendall. (Jackson, Douglas)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-2567-T-02AEP. (SJB)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16037345) filed by Joshua Rowland Coykendall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jackson, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coykendall v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Rowland Coykendall
Represented By: Douglas Gregory Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?