Bowen et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Plaintiff: Virgil A. Bowen, Jr. and Bradley J. Phares
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02708
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Remand (Dkt. #12) is denied. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #4) is denied in part and granted in part as explained herein. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint to allege additional facts in support of their slander of title claim. Any amended complaint shall be filed within fourteen (14) days of this action. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/5/2019. (SMB)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Amended MOTION to remand to State Court filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (McDonough, James)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Virgil A. Bowen, Jr, Bradley J. Phares. (Anthony, John)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Virgil A. Bowen, Jr, Bradley J. Phares. (Lafalce, Nicholas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 Amended MOTION to remand to State Court by Virgil A. Bowen, Jr, Bradley J. Phares. (Anthony, John)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Virgil A. Bowen, Jr, Bradley J. Phares. Related case(s): No (Anthony, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC identifying Corporate Parent Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Computershare Limited for Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.. (McDonough, James)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Related case(s): no (McDonough, James)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #6 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/13/2019. (JG)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Lafalce on behalf of Virgil A. Bowen, Jr, Bradley J. Phares (Lafalce, Nicholas)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to remand to State Court by Virgil A. Bowen, Jr, Bradley J. Phares. (Anthony, John)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Anthony on behalf of Virgil A. Bowen, Jr, Bradley J. Phares (Anthony, John)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (McDonough, James)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 11/6/2019. (SMB)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-2708-T-30AEP. (SJB)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Polk County Circuit Court, case number 2019CA004060 filed in State Court on 10/10/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16091297 filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDonough, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil A. Bowen, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas Lafalce
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley J. Phares
Represented By: Nicholas Lafalce
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: James Kirby McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?