PayG, LLC v. Switch, Ltd.
Plaintiff: PayG, LLC d/b/a SkySwitch and PayG, LLC
Defendant: Switch, Ltd.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02735
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by PayG, LLC. Related case(s): No (Larsen, Debra)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 11/6/2019. (SMB)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (WCD)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Switch, Ltd. (WCD) (WCD).
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-2735-T-30JSS. (SJB)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Switch, Ltd. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16099486) filed by PayG, LLC d/b/a SkySwitch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons)(Larsen, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PayG, LLC v. Switch, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PayG, LLC d/b/a SkySwitch
Represented By: Debra Deardourff Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PayG, LLC
Represented By: Debra Deardourff Larsen
Represented By: William Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Switch, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?