Welch v. Regions Bank
In Re: Frank M. Mongelluzi
Appellee: Regions Bank
Appellant: Angela Welch
Case Number: 8:2019cv02751
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #16 Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Direct Bankruptcy Court Clerk to Transmit Sealed Documents for the Record on Appeal. The Bankruptcy Clerk is directed to transmit to the Clerk of this Court as part of the record on appeal the documents contained in Dkts. 452, 481, 569, 615, 620 that were filed under seal in the bankruptcy court. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/20/2019. (SBA)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Appellant's Brief. Appellant shall have up to and including March 13, 2020 to serve and file her brief. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/19/2019. (SBA)
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Direct Bankruptcy Court Clerk to Transmit Sealed Documents for Record on Appeal and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Angela Welch. (Berman, Ceci)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Serve Appellant's Brief by Angela Welch. (Berman, Ceci)
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 11/6/19. (JNB)
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Angela Welch. (Attachments: #1 Doc 428-4 Exhibit A Part 4, #2 Doc 569 Unsealed Exhibit 12, #3 Doc 615 Unsealed Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 9, 10, 12 and 13, #4 Doc 620 unsealed Exhibit B, #5 Doc 662-2 exhibit 11 pages 1-1800, #6 Doc 662-2 exhibit 11 pages 1801-2436, #7 Doc 662-2 exhibit 11 pages 2437-2875)(JN)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Continued Hearing on Expedited Motion to Compel Court-Ordered held on 4/23/18 before Judge Caryl E. Delano. (JNB)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Claims held on 1/8/18 before Judge Caryl E. Delano. (JNB)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Angela Welch. (Attachments: #1 8-14-ap-653_Docket_000188_Reply_to_Response_in_Opposition_to_Plaintiffs_Motion_to_Compel_Production_Of_Documents_An, #2 8-14-ap-653_Docket_000282_Amended_Confidentiality_Protective_Order, #3 8-14-ap-653_Docket_000285_Notice_of_Filing_Regions_Banks_Privilege_Log_for_Jones_Day_and_Morris_Anderson__Associat, #4 8-14-ap-653_Docket_000288_Supplemental_Memorandum_of_Law_Regarding_Oral_Ruling_Made_at_March_8_2017_Hearing_in_Adva, #5 8-14-ap-653_Docket_000318_Order_Granting_Motion_of_Trustee-Plaintiffs_for_Clarification_of_Order_on_Motion_to_Compel, #6 8-14-ap-653_Docket_000593_Opposition_Response_to_Trustee_Welchs_Motion_for_Rehearing_and_Reconsideration_of_Order_D)(JN)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Angela Welch. (Attachments: #1 2 Notice of Appeal, #2 3 Order on Appeal, #3 4 Appellant Designation and Statement of Issues, #4 5 Appellee Designation, #5 6 Public Docket, #6 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000001_Part_1_COMPLAINT_against_Regions_Bank_with_Jury_Demand, #7 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000001_Part_2_Cover_Sheet, #8 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000015_AMENDED_COMPLAINT_against_Regions_Bank_with_Jury_Demand_filed_by_Angela_Welch_Related_do, #9 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000016_MOTION_for_miscellaneous_relief_specifically_to_Enforce_Standing_Order_of_Reference_and_t, #10 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000019_RESPONSE_in_Opposition_re_16_MOTION_for_miscellaneous_relief_specifically_to_Enforce_Stan, #11 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000030_NOTICE_of_supplemental_authority_re_16_MOTION_for_miscellaneous_relief_specifically_to_En, #12 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000031_ORDER_granting_16_Motion_to_Enforce_Standing_Order_of_Reference_and_to_Abate_Proceeding_T, #13 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000032_TRANSMITTAL_to_bankruptcy_court_forwarding_case_file_Copies_sent_to_Trustee_Bankruptcy_J, #14 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000040_Part_1_Motion_to_Dismiss_Adversary_Proceeding_Motion_to_Strike_Jury_Triial_and_Incorporated_Memo, #15 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000040_Part_2_Exhibit, #16 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000040_Part_3_Exhibit, #17 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000044_Response_to_Motion_to_Dismiss_and_Motion_to_Strike_Jury_Trial_Demand_Filed_by_Robert_F_Elg, #18 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000045_Response_to_Trustees_Response_in_Opposition_to_Defendants_Motion_to_Dismiss_Amended_Compla, #19 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000047_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_992014_on, #20 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000052_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_102714_on_Docket_Item_Nos_40_44_and_45_To_purchase, #21 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000055_Order_Denying_Motion_to_Dismiss_Adversary_Proceeding_And_Deferring_Motion_to_Strike_Jury_T, #22 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000059_Part_1_Answer_to_Complaint_and_Affirmative_Defenses, #23 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000059_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #24 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000064_Agreed_Order_Setting_Trial_and_Establishing_Pre-Trial_Procedures__Trial_date_set_for_531, #25 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000070_Motion_to_DismissWithdraw_Document, #26 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000073_Motion_to_Dismiss_Adversary_Proceeding_Counterclaim_of_Regions_Bank_against_Angela_Welch, #27 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000077_Agreed_Order_Denying_in_Part_Motion_to_Dismiss_Counterclaim, #28 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000080_Order_Granting_Ore_Tenus_Motion_for_Entry_of_an_Order_Referring_Case_to_Mediation_and_Appo, #29 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000081_Answer_to_Counterclaim_and_Affirmative_Defenses, #30 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000083_Mediators_Report_and_Notice_of_Inability_to_Reach_an_Agreement_in_Mediation_Filed_by_Medi, #31 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000084_Amended_Agreed_Order_Setting_Trial_and_Establishing_Pre-Trial_Procedures__Trial_date_set, #32 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000092_Agreed_Order_Denying_Motion_to_Dismiss_Adversary_Proceeding_or_Strike_Counterclaim_of_Regi, #33 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000104_Answer_to_Counterclaim_and_Affirmative_Defenses, #34 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000107_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Serve_Responses_to_Discovery_Requests_Filed_by_Edmund_S_Whitson_I, #35 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000109_Motion_for_Protective_Order_Filed_by_Edmund_S_Whitson_III_on_behalf_of_Defendant_Regions_B, #36 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000111_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Serve_Responses_to_Discovery_Requests_to_June_15, #37 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000115_Response_to_Regions_Banks_Motion_for_Protective_Order_Filed_by_Robert_F_Elgidely_Attorne, #38 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000116_Motion_for_Protective_Order_Governing_Exchange_Of_Confidential_Personal_AndOr_Proprieta, #39 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000122_Notice_of_Filing_Supplemental_Authorities_In_Opposition_To_Regions_Banks_Motion_For_Protec, #40 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000124_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_6-23-15_on_Calendar_Items_as_listed_in_Hearing_Proceedin, #41 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000127_Order_Granting_in_Part_and_Denying_in_Part_Motion_For_Protective_Order_and_Establishing_Pr, #42 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000128_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_7-7-15_on_Calendar_Items_as_listed_in_Hearing_Proceeding, #43 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000139_Part_1_Second_Motion_to_Amend_Complaint_Filed_by_Robert_F_Elgidely_Attorney_for_Trustee_on_behal, #44 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000139_Part_2_Exhibit_A_-_Proposed_Second_Amended_Complaint, #45 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000143_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Robert_Elgidely_Michael_Friedman_WIT, #46 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000145_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_1-19-16_on_Calendar_Items_as_listed_in_Hearing_Proceedin, #47 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000148_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Ed_Whitson_Benjamin_Bean_WITNESSES, #48 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000150_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_02102016_on_Continued_Second_Amended_Complaint_Filed_b, #49 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000154_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Amend_Complaint, #50 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000156_Amended_Complaint_deemed_filed_on_March_24_2016_per_Order_entered_as_Doc_154_Nature_of_S, #51 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000157_Agreed_Amended_Order_Setting_Trial_and_Establishing_PreTrial_Procedrues, #52 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000158_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_4416_on_Motions_reflected_in_Proceeding_Memo_at_Doc, #53 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000160_Answer_to_Complaint, #54 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000163_Answer_to_Counterclaim_And_Affirmative_Defenses, #55 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000165_Amended_Agreed_Order_Setting_Trial_and_Establishing_Pretrial_Procedures, #56 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000171_Motion_to_Compel_Production_Of_Defendants_Pre-Petition_Attorney-Client_And_Work_Product_Co, #57 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000175_Part_1_Motion_to_Compel_Production_Of_Documents_And_Information_Withheld_On_The_Basis_Of_The_Bank, #58 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000175_Part_2_Exhibit_1, #59 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000175_Part_3_Exhibit_2, #60 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000175_Part_4_Exhibit_3, #61 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000175_Part_5_Exhibit_4, #62 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000175_Part_6_Exhibit_5, #63 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000176_Part_1_Motion_For_Discovery_Conference_And_To_Determine_Sufficiency_Of_Defendants_Responses_To_In, #64 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000176_Part_2_Exhibit_1, #65 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000176_Part_3_Exhibit_2, #66 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000176_Part_4_Exhibit_3, #67 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000178_Joinder_of_Christine_Herendeen_as_Chapter_7_Trustee_in_Trustee_Angela_Welchs_Motion_to, #68 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000182_Joinder_of_Christine_Herendeen_as_Chapter_7_Trustee_in_Trustee_Angela_Welchs_Motion_to, #69 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000183_Mediators_Report_and_Notice_of_Inability_to_Reach_an_Agreement_in_Mediation_Filed_by_Medi, #70 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000185_Response_to_Trustees_Motion_to_Compel_Production_Of_Defendants_Pre-Petition_Attorney-Cli, #71 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000186_Response_to_Plaintiffs_Motion_To_Compel_Production_of_Documents_and_Information_Withheld, #72 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000187_Response_to_Plaintiffs_Motion_For_Discovery_Conference_And_To_Determine_Sufficiency_Of_Re, #73 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000189_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Angela_Welch_Christine_Herendeen_Bo, #74 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000190_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_11-1-16_on_1-Motion_to_Compel_Production_of_Defendants_P, #75 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000192_Order_Granting_in_Part_and_Denying_in_Part_Motion_To_Compel_Production_Of_Documents_And_In, #76 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000193_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Angela_Welch_Robert_Elgidely_James, #77 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000195_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_11-15-16_on_1-Continued_Motion_to_Compel_Production_of_D, #78 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000198_Notice_of_Service_of_Supplemental_Production_Filed_by_Edmund_S_Whitson_III_on_behalf_of_De, #79 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000199_Order_on_Plaintiffs_Motion_for_Discovery_Conference_and_to_Determine_Sufficiency_of_Defen, #80 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000200_Order_Granting_Ore_Tenus_Motion_to_Consolidate_Adversary_Proceeding_Numbers_814-ap-00653-, #81 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000204_Notice_by_Regions_Bank_of_Identification_of_Documents_Pursuant_to_Order_Filed_by_Edmund_S, #82 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000205_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Robert_Elgidely_James_Gassenheimer, #83 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000206_Part_1_Motion_for_Clarification_of_Order_Granting_in_Part_and_Denying_in_Part_Plaintiffs_Motion, #84 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000206_Part_2_Exhibit_1, #85 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000209_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_12-13-16_on_1-Continued_Motion_to_Compel_Production_Of_D, #86 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000211_Order_Granting_in_Part_and_Denying_in_Part_Motion_To_Compel_Production_Of_Defendants_Pre-P, #87 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000214_Notice_of_Filing_of_Letter_Response_From_the_Board_of_Governors_of_the_Federal_Reserve_Sys, #88 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000217_Part_1_Response_to_To_Defendants_Motion_For_Clarification_Of_Bank_Examination_Privilege_Order, #89 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000217_Part_2_Exhibit_Protective_Order, #90 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000218_Motion_For_Evidentiary_Hearing_On_Defendants_Motion_For_Clarification_Of_Bank_Examination, #91 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000219_Notice_of_Filing_Email_Response_of_Trustee_Welch_Counsel_Filed_by_Edmund_S_Whitson_III_on, #92 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000220_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Robert_Elgidely_-_Atty_for_Welch_Ang, #93 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000221_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Identify_Redacted_Portions_of_Documents_Submitted_for_In_Camera_R, #94 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000222_Notice_of_Compliance_Submission_of_Documents_for_In_Camera_Review_Filed_by_Edmund_S_Whits, #95 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000223_Notice_of_Filing_Excerpt_of_Regions_Banks_Amended_Privilege_Log_Filed_by_James_D_Gassenh, #96 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000224_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_1-11-17_on_Calendar_Items_as_listed_in_Hearing_Proceedin, #97 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000227_Response_to_To_Defendants_Motion_For_Enlargement_Of_Time_To_Identify_Redacted_Portions_Of, #98 8-14-ap-00653_Docket_000228_Order_Denying_Motion_Defendants_Motion_For_Clarification_of_Bank_Examination_Privilege_Or, #99 8-14-ap-006
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Regions Bank. Related case(s): Yes (Labbee, Laura)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Angela Welch. Related case(s): Yes (Berman, Ceci)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/3/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/19/2019. (APV)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ceci Culpepper Berman on behalf of Angela Welch (Berman, Ceci)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Labbee on behalf of Regions Bank (Labbee, Laura)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan D. Hull on behalf of Regions Bank (Hull, Bryan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Wayne Warren on behalf of Regions Bank (Warren, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Angela Welch. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:11-bk-01927-CED. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 10/23/19. (WCD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. Regions Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Frank M. Mongelluzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Regions Bank
Represented By: Jeffrey Wayne Warren
Represented By: Laura Labbee
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Angela Welch
Represented By: Joseph T. Eagleton
Represented By: Ceci Culpepper Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?