Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A. v. Blue Wave Dental Group, PLLC et al
Plaintiff: Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A.
Defendant: Frank J. Sierra, DMD, P.A., Earnest H. McDowell, Blue Wave Dental Group, PLLC, Frank J. Sierra, McDowell Orthodontics, PL, Randy M. Feldman and Randy M. Feldman, D.D.S. M.S., P.A.
Not Yet Classified: Larry Hyman
Case Number: 8:2019cv02763
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney John C. Sokatch, appearing on behalf of Defendants McDowell Orthodontics, PL and Ernest H. McDowell (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA059164.). (MCB)
December 4, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A. of Filing of Court Appointed Receiver's Certificate No.1 of Indebtedness by Larry Hyman, Receiver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolfson, Mark)
November 25, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Blue Wave Dental Group, PLLC, Randy M. Feldman, Frank J. Sierra, DMD, P.A., Randy M. Feldman, D.D.S. M.S., P.A., Frank J. Sierra. Related case(s): yes (Haas, Lee)
November 25, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice by Earnest H. McDowell, McDowell Orthodontics, PL. (Samarkos, Charles)
November 25, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Earnest H. McDowell, McDowell Orthodontics, PL. Related case(s): y (Samarkos, Charles)
November 22, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice by Blue Wave Dental Group, PLLC, Randy M. Feldman, Frank J. Sierra, DMD, P.A., Randy M. Feldman, D.D.S. M.S., P.A., Frank J. Sierra. (Haas, Lee)
November 22, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice by Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wintrust Financial Corporation for Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A. (Wolfson, Mark)
November 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A. Related case(s): yes (Wolfson, Mark)
November 21, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Larry Hyman re #21 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver Receiver Bond (Hyman, Larry)
November 20, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Larry Hyman re #21 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver Oath of Receiver (Hyman, Larry)
November 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE canceling motion hearing scheduled for 11/22/2019. (JWW)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appoint Receiver in accord with the attached order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/19/2019. (SNS)
November 18, 2019 Filing 20 Written designation and consent to act by Mark J. Wolfson on behalf of Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A.. Local Counsel: Non-Resident Counsel:. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfson, Mark)
November 18, 2019 Filing 19 Written designation and consent to act by Charles A. Samarkos on behalf of Earnest H. McDowell, McDowell Orthodontics, PL. Local Counsel: Charles A. Samarkos. Non-Resident Counsel:. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Appointing Receiver)(Samarkos, Charles)
November 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of consent to join by Blue Wave Dental Group, PLLC, Randy M. Feldman, Frank J. Sierra, DMD, P.A., Randy M. Feldman, D.D.S. M.S., P.A., Frank J. Sierra re #7 Amended MOTION to Appoint Receiver . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haas, Lee)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joanne L. Molinaro. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 11/14/2019. (AHA)
November 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Joanne L. Molinaro to appear pro hac vice by Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wolfson, Mark) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
November 14, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Joanne L. Molinaro, appearing on behalf of Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA05901.). (WCD)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of compliance re #11 Notice of hearing on motion by Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A. (Wolfson, Mark)
November 11, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER of service returned executed on 11/11/19 by Earnest H. McDowell, McDowell Orthodontics, PL as to Earnest H. McDowell, McDowell Orthodontics, PL. (Samarkos, Charles)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A. re 6 Notice to counsel of Local Rule (Wolfson, Mark)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of consent to join by Blue Wave Dental Group, PLLC, Randy M. Feldman, Frank J. Sierra, DMD, P.A., Randy M. Feldman, D.D.S. M.S., P.A., Frank J. Sierra re #7 Amended MOTION to Appoint Receiver Consent to Appointment of Receiver. (Haas, Lee)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing service and NOTICE of HEARING on #7 Amended MOTION to Appoint Receiver set for 11/22/2019 at 3:45 PM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. See attached order.(CCB)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER. Plaintiff/movant should take all steps to serve the defendants immediately. The Court will Order a hearing on Dkt. 7, motion to appoint a receiver, for November 22, 2019. The Order setting that hearing will issue today. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/8/2019. (Jung, William)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/8/2019. (SAO)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion to Appoint Receiver. See amended motion filed a docket #7. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/7/2019. (CCB)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 Amended MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Composite)(Wolfson, Mark)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel Mark J. Wolfson of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (WCD)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Blue Wave Dental Group, PLLC, Randy M. Feldman, Frank J. Sierra, DMD, P.A., Randy M. Feldman, D.D.S. M.S., P.A., Frank J. Sierra re #3 Notice of lis pendens, #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Appoint Receiver - Acceptance of Service (Haas, Lee)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-2763-T-02CPT. (LRB)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of lis pendens by Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A. (Wolfson, Mark)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Composite)(Wolfson, Mark) Modified text on 11/8/2019 (JNB).
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16120349) filed by Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Composite 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Composite 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Wolfson, Mark) Modified on 11/8/2019 (WCD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A. v. Blue Wave Dental Group, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank J. Sierra, DMD, P.A.
Represented By: Lee Lamont Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earnest H. McDowell
Represented By: Charles A. Samarkos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Wave Dental Group, PLLC
Represented By: Lee Lamont Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank J. Sierra
Represented By: Lee Lamont Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDowell Orthodontics, PL
Represented By: Charles A. Samarkos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy M. Feldman
Represented By: Lee Lamont Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy M. Feldman, D.D.S. M.S., P.A.
Represented By: Lee Lamont Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village Bank & Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Mark J. Wolfson
Represented By: Joanne L. Molinaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Larry Hyman
Represented By: Larry S. Hyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?