Faison v. Gold Care Finance Corporation
Plaintiff: Shawndra Faison
Defendant: Gold Care Finance Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv02782
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/20/2019. (APF)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Shawndra Faison (Shamis, Andrew)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of settlement by Shawndra Faison (Shamis, Andrew)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 11/21/2019 by Shawndra Faison as to Gold Care Finance Corporation. (Shamis, Andrew)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/29/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/15/2019. (APV)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/29/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/15/2019. (APV)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Gold Care Finance Corporation. (WCD)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-2782-T-35TGW. (LRB)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gold Care Finance Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16127823) filed by Shawndra Faison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Shamis, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faison v. Gold Care Finance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawndra Faison
Represented By: Andrew John Shamis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Care Finance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?