HM-09, LLC v. Holt et al
Plaintiff: HM-09, LLC and Hamburger Mary
Defendant: Florida Department of Health, Dr. Douglas Holt and Douglas Holt
Case Number: 8:2019cv02820
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 3/13/2020 at 9:00 AM before Mark A. Hanley. (Sanchez, Gilberto)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/5/2021, Dispositive motions due by 4/9/2021, Pretrial statement due by 7/20/2021, All other motions due by 7/27/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2021 at 2:15 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 9/7/2021 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 3/15/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/20/2019. (BGS)
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #7 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by HM-09, LLC. (Sanchez, Gilberto)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sanchez, Gilberto)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by HM-09, LLC. (Sanchez, Gilberto)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Response due by 12/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 11/22/2019. (Flynn, Sean)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by HM-09, LLC. (Sanchez, Gilberto) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Douglas Holt(Doctor, Individually), Douglas Holt(Doctor, In his official capacity as representative of the Florida Department of Health). (Gonzalez, Thomas)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Douglas Holt(Doctor, Individually), Douglas Holt(Doctor, In his official capacity as representative of the Florida Department of Health). (Gonzalez, Thomas)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Douglas Holt(Doctor, Individually), Douglas Holt(Doctor, In his official capacity as representative of the Florida Department of Health). Related case(s): No (Gonzalez, Thomas)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/29/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/15/2019. (BGS)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/29/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/15/2019. (BGS)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-2820-T-36SPF. (SJB)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough County, case number 19-CA-10006 filed in State Court on September 30, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16145380 filed by Douglas Holt. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gonzalez, Thomas) Modified on 11/15/2019 (WCD). Modified on 11/15/2019 (WCD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HM-09, LLC v. Holt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Health
Represented By: Thomas M. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Douglas Holt
Represented By: Thomas M. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Holt
Represented By: Thomas M. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HM-09, LLC
Represented By: Gilberto Eduardo Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamburger Mary
Represented By: Gilberto Eduardo Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?