Anderson v. Extra Space Storage
Plaintiff: Dione Anderson
Defendant: Extra Space Storage
Case Number: 8:2019cv02829
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/30/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/10/2019. (APV)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/30/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/10/2019. (APV)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 12/30/2019 to file an amended complaint that sets forth a factual basis for the Court's jurisdiction, for the claims, and for the relief requested and to file a renewed request to proceed without prepayment of fees and costs. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 11/18/2019. (JMF)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Dione Anderson. (LD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 EMERGENCY COMPLAINT against Extra Space Storage filed by Dione Anderson.(LD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Extra Space Storage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dione Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extra Space Storage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?