Anderson v. Pooley
Plaintiff: Dione Anderson
Defendant: J. Pooley
Case Number: 8:2019cv02830
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER TERMINATING CASE: The Court has reviewed this file. The emergency complaint is nonjusticiable and frivolous. The Clerk shall terminate any pending motions and close the case. The matter is dismissed. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/3/2019. (Jung, William) Modified on 12/3/2019 (CCB).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/25/2019. (SAO)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dione Anderson; recommending that plaintiff's complaint be dismissed and the motion to proceed in forma pauperis be deferred pending an opportunity for the plaintiff to file within 30 days a cognizable amended complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 11/20/2019. (DMS)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dione Anderson. (CTR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 EMERGENCY COMPLAINT against J. Pooley filed by Dione Anderson.(CTR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Pooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dione Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Pooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?