Hopkins v. Wal-mart Stores East, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Kristal Hopkins
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, L.P. and Wal-mart Stores East, L.P.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02833
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hudgins, Drew)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/30/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/10/2019. (APV)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/30/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/10/2019. (APV)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wal-mart Stores East, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores, Inc, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC for Wal-mart Stores East, L.P... (Edwards, William)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Wal-mart Stores East, L.P.. Related case(s): Yes (Edwards, William)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Notice of pendency of related cases by Kristal Hopkins. (Hudgins, Drew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 3 Notice to counsel of Local Rule per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kristal Hopkins. Related case(s): No (Hudgins, Drew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant AMENDED ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Wal-mart Stores East, L.P..(Edwards, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Wal-mart Stores East, L.P..(Edwards, William)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Suzette L. Russomanno of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (WCD)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-2833-T-35CPT. (SJB)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hernando County Court, case number 2019CA001099 filed in State Court on 10/17/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16153098 filed by Walmart Stores East, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Edwards, William) Modified on 11/18/2019 (WCD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. Wal-mart Stores East, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristal Hopkins
Represented By: Kenneth A. Minio
Represented By: Drew Ben Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: William Henry Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: William Henry Edwards
Represented By: Jerry Dean Hamilton
Represented By: Suzette Russomanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?