Fleurima v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lourdes Fleurima
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2019cv02835
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BSN)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 11/19/2019. (CDM)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/10. (WCD)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of service by Lourdes Fleurima re #4 Notice of designation of track . (Steinberg, Michael)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1 (Attachments: #1 re: consent to proceed before magistrate judge)(MSS)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-2835-T-24AAS. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. (SJB)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Lourdes Fleurima. (Steinberg, Michael)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Lourdes Fleurima. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Steinberg, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleurima v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lourdes Fleurima
Represented By: Michael Alan Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?