Paris v. Saint Leo University Incorporated
Plaintiff: Antony Paris
Defendant: Saint Leo University Incorporated
Case Number: 8:2019cv02839
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Saint Leo University Incorporated. Related case(s): yes (Holt, Michael)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Saint Leo University Incorporated. (Holt, Michael)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by January 28, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/20/2019. (DMD)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER of service returned executed on 11/19/2019 by Antony Paris as to Saint Leo University Incorporated. (Klepper, Gabrielle)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Antony Paris. (Klepper, Gabrielle)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Antony Paris. Related case(s): no (Klepper, Gabrielle)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Saint Leo University Incorporated. (WCD)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/19/2019. (TWL)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/19/2019. (TWL)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-2839-T-33JSS. (SJB)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Saint Leo University Incorporated with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16155431) filed by Antony Paris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Klepper, Gabrielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paris v. Saint Leo University Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Leo University Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Aaron Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antony Paris
Represented By: Gabrielle Elizabeth Klepper
Represented By: Gary Martoccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?