Arroyo v. Hillsborough County Public Schools
Plaintiff: LAKESHIA ARROYO
Defendant: Hillsborough County Public Schools
Case Number: 8:2019cv02848
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Hillsborough county public schools for The school Board of Hillsborough County and dropping defendant superintendent of schools by Lakeshia Arroyo. (Romano, Jay)
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically for Case Mgt. Conference by Lakeshia Arroyo. (Romano, Jay) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 1/14/2020. (SRC)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for extension of time. The defendant is to file its response to the plaintiff's complaint by January 21, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 1/6/2020. (MLM)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Hillsborough County Public Schools. (Elias, Zarra) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 12/8/2019 by Lakeshia Arroyo as to Hillsborough County Public Schools. (LNR)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Hillsborough County Public Schools. (CRH)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 ***PURSUANT TO THE ATTORNEY CIVIL CASE OPENING PROCEDURES GUIDE LOCATED ON OUR WEBSITE www.flmd.uscourts.gov, COUNSEL IS NOTIFIED TO PROVIDE THE CLERK WITH THE APPROPRIATE SERVICE FORMS AND COPIES FOR SERVICE IN PAPER; THE CLERK WILL ISSUE THE SUMMONS UPON RECEIPT OF THE FORMS***PROPOSED summons to be issued by Lakeshia Arroyo. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 285 SUMMONS SERVICE)(Romano, Jay) Modified on 11/22/2019 (JNB).
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 ***COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO PREPARE A SUMMONS USING THE FORM LOCATED ON www.flmd.uscourts.gov and to provide the Clerk with the appropriate service forms in paper to provide to the United States Marshals Service**PROPOSED summons to be issued by Lakeshia Arroyo. (Romano, Jay) Modified on 11/21/2019 (JNB).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. See order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 11/20/2019. (MLM)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-2848-T-60AAS. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. (SJB)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by LAKESHIA ARROYO. (Romano, Jay)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LAKESHIA ARROYO. (Romano, Jay)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hillsborough County Public Schools with Jury Demand filed by Lakeshia Arroyo. (Attachments: #1 Appendix verification, #2 Affidavit IN FORMA PAUPERIS, #3 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Romano, Jay) Modified on 11/20/2019 (WCD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arroyo v. Hillsborough County Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKESHIA ARROYO
Represented By: Jay F. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Public Schools
Represented By: Zarra R. Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?