Taylor v. Secretary, Department of Corrections, et al (Hillsborough County)
Defendant: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Petitioner: John Dabney Taylor
Respondent: Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections
Case Number: 8:2019cv02982
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. Respondent has 90 days to respond. Petitioner has 30 days to reply to the petition response. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Service Documents)(RAO)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1 issued by Deputy Clerk on 12/10/2019. (SRC)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-2982-T-60AEP. (SJB)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by John Dabney Taylor of filing Civil Cover Sheet (Reese, Rachael)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 113A-16215556) filed by John Dabney Taylor.(Reese, Rachael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Secretary, Department of Corrections, et al (Hillsborough County)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Dabney Taylor
Represented By: Rachael Elizabeth Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General, State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?