Atkins et al v. Sarasota County Florida et al
Plaintiff: Mary Mack, Michael White and Fredd Atkins
Defendant: Sarasota County Florida, Michael A Moran, Alan Maio, Nancy C Detert, Nancy C. Detert, Sarasota County, Florida and Michael A. Moran
Case Number: 8:2019cv03048
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Joseph Elbrecht on behalf of Sarasota County, Florida. (Elbrecht, Frederick)
February 6, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of hearing: JURY TRIAL and PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING set for 4/27/2020 at 8:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15B before Judge William F. Jung. (See also DE 27) (SAO)
February 5, 2020 Filing 28 ***TERMINATED, counsel must file a Notice of Appearance on docket.***NOTICE by Sarasota County, Florida (Elbrecht, Frederick) Modified text on 2/5/2020 (LNR).
February 4, 2020 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Dispositive motions due by 4/19/2020. (LNR)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORAL ORDER granting in part and denying in part the #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Count Three of the Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The individual defendants are dismissed with prejudice. The #15 Motion to Expedite is GRANTED. The Court sets the following deadlines. Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Trial: April 27, 2020 at 8:00 A.M. Discovery Cut-off: April 17, 2020. Dispositive Motions and Motion for Injunction: April 19, 2020. Responses to Requests for Documents, Admissions, and Interrogatories are due within 21 days. The #17 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED (See Clerk's Minutes dated 2/04/2020 for details). Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/4/2020. (SAO)
February 4, 2020 Filing 26 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge William F. Jung: MOTION HEARING held on 2/4/2020 re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael A. Moran, Nancy C. Detert, Alan Maio, and Sarasota County, Florida; #17 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Michael A. Moran, Nancy C. Detert, Alan Maio, and Sarasota County, Florida; and #15 MOTION to Expedite Scheduling Conference filed by Fredd Atkins, Michael White, and Mary Mack. Court Reporter: Tracey Aurelio (SAO)
February 4, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for protective order filed by Nancy C. Detert, Alan Maio, Michael A. Moran, Sarasota County, Florida. (Bardos, Andy)
February 4, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Nancy C. Detert, Alan Maio, Michael A. Moran, Sarasota County, Florida. (Bardos, Andy)
February 3, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION for protective order filed by Fredd Atkins, Mary Mack, Michael White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Kellogg, Lawrence)
February 3, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Expedite Scheduling Conference filed by Nancy C. Detert, Alan Maio, Michael A. Moran, Sarasota County, Florida. (Bardos, Andy)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED ENDORSED ORDER: Hugh Franklin Culverhouse, Jr., Esq., shall have until 2/28/2020 to register for CM/ECF access. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/3/2020. (SAO)
February 3, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Fredd Atkins, Mary Mack, Michael White. (Kellogg, Lawrence)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon review of the record, the Court finds that Plaintiffs' lead counsel, Hugh Franklin Culverhouse, Jr., has not registered for CM/ECF access. Accordingly, the Court directs counsel to register for CM/ECF access by February 10, 2020. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/3/2020. (SAO)
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC HEARING on all pending issues and motions including #17 MOTION for protective order set for 2/4/2020 at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Counsel should follow the same instructions at docket 16. (CCB)
January 29, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for protective order by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Martinez Order)(Bardos, Andy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
January 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC HEARING on all pending issues including #14 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , #15 MOTION to Expedite Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Counsel are directed to call the reserved conference toll free number at 1-888-557-8511. Enter the access code: 4744914 followed by the #(pound) key. You will be prompted to enter the security code: 3048 followed by the #(pound) key. This conference will be activated at 1:00 PM so the hearing may start promptly at 1:30 PM.(CCB)
January 24, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Expedite Scheduling Conference by Fredd Atkins, Mary Mack, Michael White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kellogg, Lawrence)
January 22, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Nancy C. Detert, Alan Maio, Michael A. Moran, Sarasota County, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Previous Districts, #2 Exhibit B - New Districts, #3 Exhibit C - Census Data, #4 Exhibit D - Population Estimates)(Bardos, Andy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Tal Aburos on behalf of Fredd Atkins, Mary Mack, Michael White. (Aburos, Tal)
January 16, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Nancy C. Detert, Alan Maio, Michael A. Moran, Sarasota County, Florida. (Bardos, Andy)
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by George T. Levesque on behalf of Nancy C. Detert, Alan Maio, Michael A. Moran, Sarasota County, Florida. (Levesque, George)
January 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andy Bardos on behalf of Nancy C. Detert, Alan Maio, Michael A. Moran, Sarasota County, Florida. (Bardos, Andy)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Michael White, Mary Mack, Fredd Atkins.(Kellogg, Lawrence)
December 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond to #1 Complaint. Sarasota County, Florida answer or response due 1/16/2020. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/29/2019. (CCB)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Nancy C. Detert, Alan Maio, Michael A. Moran, Sarasota County, Florida. (Pearce, David)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by Sarasota County, Florida. (Pearce, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Fredd Atkins, Mary Mack, Michael White. (Kellogg, Lawrence)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (LNR)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/13/2019. (SAO)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-3048-T-02CPT. (SJB)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16245168) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Kellogg, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atkins et al v. Sarasota County Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarasota County Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Maio
Represented By: Andy Bardos
Represented By: George T. Levesque
Represented By: David Michael Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy C Detert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy C. Detert
Represented By: Andy Bardos
Represented By: George T. Levesque
Represented By: David Michael Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarasota County, Florida
Represented By: Frederick Joseph Elbrecht
Represented By: Andy Bardos
Represented By: George T. Levesque
Represented By: David Michael Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Moran
Represented By: Andy Bardos
Represented By: George T. Levesque
Represented By: David Michael Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Mack
Represented By: Lawrence Allan Kellogg
Represented By: Tal Aburos
Represented By: Hugh Franklin Culverhouse, Jr.
Represented By: Przemyslaw L. Dominko
Represented By: Steven David Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael White
Represented By: Lawrence Allan Kellogg
Represented By: Tal Aburos
Represented By: Hugh Franklin Culverhouse, Jr.
Represented By: Przemyslaw L. Dominko
Represented By: Steven David Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredd Atkins
Represented By: Lawrence Allan Kellogg
Represented By: Tal Aburos
Represented By: Hugh Franklin Culverhouse, Jr.
Represented By: Przemyslaw L. Dominko
Represented By: Steven David Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?