Wave Linx LLC v. Outreach Corporation
Plaintiff: Wave Linx LLC
Defendant: Outreach Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv03144
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #9 Plaintiff's Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant Outreach Corporation shall have up to and including February 27, 2020 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. In all future instances in which the Parties seek relief from the Court, to ensure that court review is triggered in the automated court filing system, the Parties shall file a motion rather than a stipulation. Otherwise, the stipulation may sit dormant on the docket without any indication that court intervention is required. As a courtesy in this instance only, the Court will treat Plaintiff's Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint as a Motion. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/24/2020. (MWC)
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Wave Linx LLC. Related case(s): y (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum 1)(Wernow, Howard)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Wave Linx LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Wave Linx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wernow, Howard)
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 01/07/2020 by Wave Linx LLC as to Outreach Corporation. (Wernow, Howard)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/28/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/14/2020. (APV)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The parties shall utilize the ATTACHED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FORM. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/28/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/14/2020. (APV)
December 24, 2019 Filing 5 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BES)
December 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Outreach Corporation. (BES)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-3144-T-35TGW. (SJB)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wave Linx LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Outreach Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16287726) filed by Wave Linx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US Patent 8,843,549, #2 Exhibit B-Exemplary Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wave Linx LLC v. Outreach Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outreach Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wave Linx LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?