United States of America v. Lookabaugh
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Kelli Lookabaugh
Case Number: 8:2019mc00020
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/24/2019. (GMD)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE cancelling show-cause hearing scheduled for June 12, 2019. (DMP)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by United States of America (Griffin, Lindsay)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to show cause. A show-cause hearing is scheduled for June 12, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in Tampa Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 3/27/2019. (DMP)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Amy L. Ham by United States of America. (JCG)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lookabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Joseph Michael Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kelli Lookabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?