Universitas Education, LLC v. Robinson
Plaintiff: Universitas Education, LLC
Defendant: Jack E. Robinson, III and Jack E. Robinson
Petitioner: Lillian Granderson
Case Number: 8:2019mc00030
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of hearing on #9 Plaintiff Universitas Education, LLC's Motion to Compel Deposition and Production under Subpoena. Motion Hearing set for July 23, 2019 at 9:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 11A before Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Parties may appear telephonically. On time and date of hearing, counsel may call 877-411-9748 and enter access code 9873012 followed by security code 0030 and pound (#) key. (JAR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Lillian Granderson (KMM)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER directing Lillian Granderson to respond to #9 Plaintiff Universitas Education, LLC's Motion to Compel Deposition and Production Under Subpoena by July 1, 2019. Without a timely response, the Court may deem the motion unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 6/24/2019. (JAR)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Production Under Subpoena by Universitas Education, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Kelly, Carlos) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Modified text and description on 6/7/2019 (KMM).
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part #4 the Motion to Stay Deposition; granting in part and denying in part #1 Non-Party Witness Lillian Granderson's Motion to Quash Harassing Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 3/28/2019. (JAR)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 3/27/2019 re #1 MOTION to quash subpoena filed by Lillian Granderson, #4 MOTION to stay re #1 MOTION to quash subpoena filed by Lillian Granderson. (DIGITAL) (KAC)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of hearing: Telephone Conference set for March 27, 2019 at 1:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 11A before Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. At the time of hearing, counsel shall call 877-411-9748 and enter access code 9873012 followed by security code 0030 and pound (#) key. (JAR)
March 26, 2019 FEES paid by Lillian Granderson (Filing fee $47.00 receipt number TPA055883) (ARC)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to stay Deposition re #1 MOTION to quash subpoena by Lillian Granderson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BSN)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to quash subpoena Plaintiff Universitas Education, LLC's Opposition to Non-Party Lillian Granderson's Motion to Quash filed by Universitas Education, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Status Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit Robinson Complaint, #3 Exhibit Robinson 2008 Letter, #4 Exhibit Promissory Note Signed Robinson, #5 Exhibit Robinson 2009 Letter, #6 Exhibit Evans Affidavit, #7 Exhibit Granderson Subpoena)(Kelly, Carlos)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (KMM)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to quash subpoena by Lillian Granderson. (Attachments: #1 exhibit)(KMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universitas Education, LLC v. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack E. Robinson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack E. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universitas Education, LLC
Represented By: Joseph L. Manson
Represented By: Carlos A. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lillian Granderson
Represented By: Jeraldine Williams-Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?