United States of America v. Potter
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Robert Potter
Case Number: 8:2019mc00071
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/15/2019. (APF)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE canceling show cause hearing scheduled for 8/7/2019. In light of the filed Notice of Voluntary, the hearing is canceled. (NCR)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by United States of America (Tompkins, Joseph)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 PROOF of service by United States of America. (Tompkins, Joseph)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to show cause as to Robert Potter. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 11B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn., Show Cause Response due by 7/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/19/2019. (NCR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marcos Avila, #2 IRS Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Joseph Michael Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?