United States of America v. Sculthorpe

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Stephen Sculthorpe
Case Number: 8:2019mc00081
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/6/2019. (GMD)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by United States of America. (Tompkins, Joseph)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Setting Hearing re #1 MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons: Show Cause Hearing set for 9/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 B before Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 7/16/2019. (BEE)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Barbara Gordon, #2 IRS Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sculthorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Joseph Michael Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Sculthorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?