United States of America v. Hein
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: David R. Hein, Jr.
Case Number: 8:2019mc00091
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #3 Order Setting Hearing on Motion filed by David R. Hein, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Phillips, A.)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for clarification: The date of the order controls, the response is due October 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/1/2019. (Wilson, Thomas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for clarification re #3 Order Setting Hearing on Motion and 3.01(g) Certificate or Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition by David R. Hein, Jr. (Phillips, A.)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 US Marshal 285 form for service of petition as to David R. Hein on 09/12/19. (BES)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Setting Hearing on #1 Petitioner's MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons: Show Cause Hearing set for 10/24/2019 at 02:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 12A before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. The respondent shall respond to the petition within 20 days from the date of this Order. The Internal Revenue Service or United States Marshal Service shall serve upon the respondent, by September 20, 2019, a copy of this Order, together with the petition and exhibits. Proof of service shall be filed with the Clerk as soon as practicable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/4/2019. (DMS)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ENDORSED ORDER: United States of America's Petition to Enforce IRS Summons (Doc. #1) is hereby referred to the Honorable Thomas G. Wilson, United States Magistrate Judge, for the issuance of a report and recommendation, including any hearings, motions, and deadlines related thereto. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/22/2019. (SGM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(BES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Hein, Jr.
Represented By: A. Brian Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Joseph Michael Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?