Bey v. McEwen
Plaintiff: Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey
Defendant: Catherine Peek McEwen
Case Number: 8:2020cv00004
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge #13 is adopted, confirmed, and approved in all respects and is made a part of this Order for all purposes, including appellate review. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without leave to amend, as amendment would be futile. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this file. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/20/2020. (BGS)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #14 Motion for default. See Doc.13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/6/2020. (Wilson, Thomas)
January 30, 2020 Filing 22 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (TDC)
January 30, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice, #11 Notice of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. Related case(s): yes (TDC) Modified on 1/31/2020 (TDC).
January 29, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT Accompanying Motion for Permission to Appeal in Forma Pauperis by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LD)
January 29, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Court Bond/Security by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LD)
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 Certification of Identity by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey (LD)
January 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTE by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey (LD)
January 29, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE to the Court of Affidavit of Fact Emergency Affidavit for Preliminary Injunction by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LD)
January 29, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of refusal by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey (LD)
January 29, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED APPLICATION to enforce default by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(LD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
January 28, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency filed by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey; recommending that complaint be dismissed without leave to amend and that the case be closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/28/2020. (DMS)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (TDC)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. Related case(s): yes (TDC)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 OBJECTION re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice. (TDC)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/6/2020. (BGS)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/6/2020. (BGS)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Right to Redeem by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (TDC)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Fraud on the Court by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (TDC)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Joinder of Claims by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (TDC)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Jurisdiction by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (TDC)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit, #2 Supplement 1, #3 Supplement 2)(TDC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Catherine Peek McEwen with Jury Demand filed by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Specific Performance, #2 Complaint for Interpleader and Declaratory Relief, #3 Third Party Complaint)(TDC)
January 2, 2020 Remark: Received form for service not on appropriate AO forms. (TDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. McEwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Peek McEwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?